Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Andrea R Wood
Case #: 1:24-cv-02616
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 3:41 AM CDT
Defendant
huayi art painting
Defendant
oitushop
Defendant
onicaa
Defendant
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Defendant
- SUPREME EWAN -
Defendant
0hGeez
Defendant
1 ChelsiSilvers
Defendant
2 z mobilcar Wash detailing
Defendant
206Grafiks
Defendant
4ChristCreation
Defendant
79 Minor
Defendant
A Lishaclothing
Defendant
A PurplJoday
Defendant
AGAMIWORLD
Defendant
AKedits25
Defendant
ALavenderLife
Defendant
AOPlus
Defendant
AVAstore2
Defendant
AVDArts
Defendant
Aarya357
Defendant
AbstraDesign
Defendant
Accessoryking
Defendant
Achraf eddin Laifa
Defendant
Adeline COURTOIS
Defendant
Adelskrone
Defendant
Adiasa Rahma
Defendant
Adicto
Defendant
Adm Str
Defendant
Aggressipumk
Defendant
Ahmed El-Hamedy
Defendant
Ainar67
Defendant
AlbinoRaven
Defendant
Alec04
Defendant
Alexander Chakhutin
Defendant
AliasDesignsUK
Defendant
Alinah89
Defendant
AllenDavisArt
Defendant
Aloysius Mascarenhas
Defendant
AmeowsingCats
Defendant
AnanthuNb
Defendant
AnarKitty805
Defendant
Angela Tripp
Defendant
AnimalisticWear
Defendant
AntoniosShop
Defendant
AnyTimeShow
Defendant
Aourik-4you
Defendant
Apostrophy Studio
Defendant
Ariela-Alez
Defendant
ArtImmaterium
Defendant
Artwork-Seeker
Defendant
Asepart
Defendant
Awesome Prints
Defendant
AyrioArt
Defendant
BADR
Defendant
BDSign
Defendant
BSdesign90
Defendant
BSpring
Defendant
BTGIRL
Defendant
Babush-kat
Defendant
Bane Designs
Defendant
Barry Martin
Defendant
Bazzar-Designs
Defendant
BeauStore
Defendant
Beautifumess Undefined
Defendant
Bell Best
Defendant
Bellezzacalistab
Defendant
Ben Johnson
Defendant
Bennett Wager
Defendant
BestTshirtVikn
Defendant
Bhaskar Das
Defendant
Bhavik Mehta
Defendant
Bi3c21t
Defendant
BillyBuChip
Defendant
Blossom-123
Defendant
Blue Heart
Defendant
Blue-Ocean-22
Defendant
Bookuotes
Defendant
BornInThe1990s
Defendant
Brian Grant
Defendant
Bring to you
Defendant
BrookndaleCraft
Represented By
Wesley E. Johnson
Cross-Border Counselor LLP
contact info
Benjamin Solter
Cross-Boarder Counselor, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bruno Amorim
Defendant
Bruno Guedes
Defendant
Bruno Pires
Defendant
BumosherZangUNG Art
Defendant
Burst Of LovIn Homcare
Defendant
CO sticker
Defendant
COCO CASE
Defendant
CaddyZ
Defendant
Caesar Velez
Defendant
Caffe-Mocha
Defendant
Callalily5
Defendant
Camila Soares
Defendant
Can Brother alien painting
Defendant
CardMeCrazy
Defendant
Carlos Rosa
Defendant
Cat Lovers Home
Defendant
Chris Byrne
Defendant
Chris Noble
Defendant
Christopher Murray
Defendant
Christopher Payne
Defendant
Christs House
Defendant
Chrysanthemum-Mariele
Defendant
ClairDavies
Defendant
CloudsReed
Defendant
DanieBennett
Defendant
Daniela Gonzalez
Defendant
Daniela Rodriguez
Defendant
DaniellMiller
Defendant
DaniellThompson
Defendant
DaviChiu
Defendant
DaviConnolly
Defendant
DaviElkington
Defendant
Deepak Mohan
Defendant
Deidre Snifter
Defendant
Divyanshu Singh
Defendant
Doug White
Defendant
Douglas Lima
Defendant
Douglas Santos
Defendant
Drumbeat Juanita
Defendant
Eduardo Diniz
Defendant
Eight-Year Calypso
Defendant
Elizabeth Morris
Defendant
Elizabeth Nelson
Defendant
EriLee
Defendant
Eric Simmons
Defendant
Erin Donovan
Defendant
Erin Roberts
Defendant
Evelyn Martinez
Defendant
FAHION ART
Defendant
FANGXINGYU
Defendant
Fs fun sticker shop
Defendant
G Electronics
Defendant
G Palelei
Defendant
Gabriel Moreno
Defendant
Gary Anderson
Defendant
Gary Collins
Defendant
Gary Crawford
Defendant
George Mikhail
Defendant
George Smith
Defendant
Gilemette Comprehension
Defendant
Gokul Krishna
Defendant
GoomedicinHeather c young
Defendant
Greg Butler
Defendant
Greg Ford
Defendant
HOHO WALL ART
Defendant
HONGKAI
Defendant
Harassment Resigned
Defendant
Ian Cunningham
Defendant
Ian Mcdonald
Defendant
Ian Stephenson
Defendant
Inhaler Hunched
Defendant
Ishita Mukherjee
Defendant
Islam Elhosiny
Defendant
Ismail Al Hammadi
Defendant
Ivory New Zealand
Defendant
Joseph Sortland
Defendant
Just Thumbnail
Defendant
Katya Andresen
Defendant
Kenechukwu Orakwute
Defendant
Kevin
Defendant
Kevin Wang
Defendant
KishorKumar
Defendant
Large H
Defendant
Lauretta Juxtaposition
Defendant
Linn Fritz
Defendant
M RezauIslam
Defendant
MEREN
Represented By
Timothy Tiewei Wang
Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
MISOLAAA
Represented By
Timothy Tiewei Wang
Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mandi
Defendant
Mandy factory
Defendant
Manufactured Riverbed
Defendant
Mark Reo
Defendant
MichaeAdamczewski
Defendant
MichaeMcqueary Esq
Defendant
Mityson
Defendant
My DarlingPet
Defendant
Neille Small-Scale
Defendant
PINE NUT
Defendant
Pawan Sharma
Defendant
Problematic Nancie
Defendant
Qin grain
Defendant
RacheZoe
Defendant
Randy Petersen crpc
Defendant
Rich KSA
Defendant
RidedMist
Defendant
Rohit Yadav
Defendant
Sachin Patil
Defendant
SallyCloth
Defendant
Sasa DIY Patch
Defendant
Shubham Mishra
Defendant
Sj Borsari
Defendant
Slimy Othella
Defendant
Sohibart
Defendant
Sorrowful Airfoil
Defendant
Soul Car Stickers
Defendant
Sukanto Debnath
Defendant
Sunflower SF
Defendant
SweetTaylor
Defendant
TCAR
Defendant
TSY Phone Case
Defendant
Thabo
Defendant
Thwack Ill
Defendant
Torrey Monceaux
Defendant
Tsinghon
Defendant
Ukonwa Kuzi-orizu ojo
Defendant
Unresponsive Julieta
Defendant
VAVA Headphone Case
Defendant
VVS Made
Defendant
Vijay Kumar
Defendant
Vivek Singh
Defendant
Weierda
Defendant
Wendye Usable
Defendant
Worldwide Ddene
Defendant
YALI FASHION
Defendant
YMama
Defendant
Yash Gupta
Defendant
Yellow Enclave
Defendant
YiXin Electronic
Defendant
Yishaotian
Defendant
Youth Forest two
Defendant
ZQQ
Defendant
agible
Defendant
ahhbingbing
Defendant
akmdesign
Defendant
alchemydesign95
Defendant
alexbilal
Defendant
alwaysbright
Defendant
andrews11
Defendant
anotherkali
Defendant
arkeetech
Defendant
artnergy-shop
Defendant
aryan9700
Defendant
aswIDN
Defendant
auroragalavis
Defendant
avancee
Defendant
belugastore
Defendant
beyou-tiful
Defendant
binhlum
Defendant
blueclan
Defendant
bodzasara
Defendant
buenogoods
Defendant
buihaingan
Defendant
bwriley
Defendant
cadcamcaefea
Plaintiff
Grumpy Cat Limited
Represented By
Michael A. Hierl
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd
contact info
Robert Payton Mcmurray
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
John Wilson
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
William Benjamin Kalbac
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Artibot
Terminated: 08/20/2024
Defendant
Bad bad girl
Terminated: 05/23/2024
Defendant
DHZONEPARTS
Terminated: 08/20/2024
Defendant
Graceasy
Terminated: 05/21/2024
Defendant
LANG TWO
Terminated: 08/20/2024
Defendant
MiniBaby kids
Terminated: 08/06/2024


Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 12:50 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (jmv, )
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Grumpy Cat Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21807333.(Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Part 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Part 2
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Grumpy Cat Limited (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM by Grumpy Cat Limited in support of motion for temporary restraining order,11 (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Bundesen Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Part 2,
Att: 5 Declaration Hierl Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1,
Att: 7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2,
Att: 8 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3
13 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 1 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 2 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 6 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 7 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 8 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 9 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 10 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 11 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
24 24 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 12 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 13 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 14 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 15 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 16 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
29 29 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 17 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
30 30 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 3 Part 18 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
31 31 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Grumpy Cat Limited (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]