Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Kennelly
Case #: 1:24-cv-02622
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Defendant
Chengdu Hengyuan Shenrun Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Chengdu Lijia technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Chengdu Wei Xiaohu furniture Co., LTD
Defendant
Dongguan City is Xuanyu e-commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Dongguan Dingcheng Home Co., LTD
Defendant
Dongguan Mei Zhen Chang trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Dongguan Taiyuan Zi trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Dongguan can Gu electronic commerce technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Fuzhou Dachion Import&Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Glens Technology (Shenzhen) Co., LTD
Defendant
Guangzhou Jiedong clothing Co., LTD
Defendant
Guangzhou Jiexing network Co., LTD
Defendant
Guangzhou Nandiwang Mall Co., LTD
Defendant
Guizhou Huatong Wangda trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Hefei Yingji Electronic Commerce Co. LTD
Defendant
Henan Zlovy Enterprise Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Huizhou Good E-Business Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jiujiang Hui Xun electronic Commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #142
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #143
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #178
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #183
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #188
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #52
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #58
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace Doe Seller #66
Defendant
Ningbo Morezhome Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Pujiang County Jinjiu e-commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Shandong Runyang Supply Chain Management Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai Chaulying Network Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shanghai T-Win Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai Zhanxing Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Aigaju e-commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Amoer Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Aohai Star trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Aoruicheng Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Beian Top Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Boyifa Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Chengminghao electronic Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Cloud Yi intelligent network Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Debs Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Desiole Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Falaiwang Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Fengyuan Foreign Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Gaoxun Bo technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Hongji supply chain Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Hongyuan Supply chain Management Co. LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Husky trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen JYC Technology Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Jiplay luggage Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Kaihan Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Kaiyuan da electronic Commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Kefei shoes Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen LAN Si network technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Landa flying trade Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Lefeng Technology Company Limited
Defendant
Shenzhen Proto trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Qian Hengmao Hardware Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Qianhai Haiyi Industrial Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Qianhai Phoenix Network Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Qianhai Runbu Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Rongfa Xin trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Shangqing building Materials Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Shengda source e-commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Shengqi Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Sikang Ai jewelry Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Teenwei Network Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Tianshi Optical Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Tianyu Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Wish List network Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Xi Blue technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Xiangning Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Ya Che clothing Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Yingfan trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Yixin New Energy Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Youshi Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Yu Song Jie trade Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Zhendi clothing Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen ander online trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen best best network technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen empty barn technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen old tree network technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen shallow China trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen strange jewelry Co., LTD
Defendant
Sichuan Runbu top fire e-commerce Co., LTD
Defendant
Suzhou Sunrise Technologies Ltd.
Defendant
Wuhan Yi Aishanni trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Yangjiang Yihaiyuan Information Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Fanxing Chujie Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Luoying e-commerce Co., Ltd
Defendant
Yiwu Xucong Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yushan Trade (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Zhongshan Ruihu Technology Co., Ltd
Defendant
Zhuzhou Jianghua clothing Co., LTD
Defendant
asygadgets
Defendant
billychell
Defendant
captainloft
Defendant
charsey
Defendant
chill-lifestyle-shop
Defendant
crazyproductz
Defendant
eclick360
Defendant
elevatemall
Defendant
harkala
Defendant
haulydream
Defendant
hazeboulevard
Defendant
homehomeplus
Defendant
limodou
Defendant
make2u
Defendant
needfulstuff.se
Defendant
odditygate
Defendant
outlesshop
Defendant
perfectbuyshop
Defendant
sociableweavernest
Defendant
stylhigh
Defendant
tikofriends
Defendant
zayzik
Defendant
zonegag
Defendant
zopistyle
Plaintiff
Draft Top, Inc.
Represented By
James Edward Judge
Flener Ip And Business Law
contact info
Ying Chen
Flener Ip & Business Law
contact info
Zareefa Burki Flener
Flener Ip & Business Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Teenwei Network Technology Co., LTD


Docket last updated: 04/02/2024 11:40 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
1 1 24 pgs COMPLAINT filed by DT, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21808135.(Judge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule A,
Att: 2 Ex.1,
Att: 3 Ex.2,
Att: 4 Ex.3
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Judge, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DT, Inc. by James Edward Judge (Judge, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION by Plaintiff DT, Inc. for leave to file Documents Under Seal (Judge, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff DT, Inc. Unredacted Complaint(Judge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule A,
Att: 2 Ex.1