Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:24-cv-00954
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court For Calvert County - Family, 04-C-11-000886
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark W. Carmean
Defendant
Mark S. Chandlee
Defendant
Circuit Court of Calvert County
Defendant
Tammy Lafferty
Defendant
Kathy P. Smith
Defendant
DFC Chip Ward
Plaintiff
Demar Rynell Mason
P.O. Box 1334
Lusby, MD 20657


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/08 2:16 PM
ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing without prejudice1 COMPLAINT; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/8/2024. (c/m 05/08/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
5 5 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 04/16 11:00 AM
Correspondence from Demar Rynell Mason(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Attachment,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 order Case Management Order Tue 04/02 2:16 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/2/2024. (c/m 04/02/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Tue 04/02 1:15 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Demar Rynell Mason. (c/m 04/02/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/02 1:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demar Rynell Mason(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Mark W. Carmean, Mark S. Chandlee, Circuit Court of Calvert County, Tammy Lafferty, Kathy P. Smith, Chip Ward, filed by Demar Rynell Mason.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Envelope