Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00154
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Walter & Mason Retail, Inc.
Represented By
Mallory H. Gantt
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Stephen H. Price
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Cowan
Represented By
Zachary J Burkhalter
The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
David A Burkhalter, II
The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
David Alexander Burkhalter, III
The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/02 10:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal case by Jeremy Cowan. (Burkhalter, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
24 24 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 07/29 12:02 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/29/2024. (SLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
23 23 motion Protective Order Thu 07/25 3:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc..(Price, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Protective Order
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 07/25 3:20 PM
ORDER denying 21 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/25/2024. See Order for details. (SLM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
21 21 motion Protective Order Wed 07/17 3:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc..(Price, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Agreed Protective Order
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
20 20 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/16 12:36 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mallory Gantt re17 Scheduling Order. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 07/10 2:57 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Burkhalter, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Wed 07/10 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Jeremy Cowan (Burkhalter, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/02 3:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/18/2025 09:00 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2025 11:00 AM.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 2, 2024. (SAC) Modified on 7/2/2024, Order mailed to Mallory H. Gantt Jackson Lewis P.C. 611 Commerce Street Suite 3102 Nashville, TN 37203. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 06/25 1:35 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 06/25/2024. (Copy of Order mailed Mallory Gantt) (CAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
Monday, June 24, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/24 3:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc..(Price, Stephen)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Mon 06/24 3:13 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stand Out for Good, Inc. for Walter & Mason Retail, Inc.. (Price, Stephen)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Annotation Mon 06/24 11:06 AM
Gavel Order Doc #13 mailed to Mallory H. Gantt. (SLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/21 3:38 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 06/21/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mallory Gantt (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt 300004020.) by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc..(MKM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Other Envelope
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Thu 06/20 4:16 PM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete as to Mallory Gantt regarding document: 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
misc Public Docket Annotation Wed 06/12 1:17 PM
Gavel Order, Doc. 11 mailed to Attorney Mallory Gantt. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/11 5:16 PM
Now before the Court is the Joint Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. 9]. In light of no opposition, the Court ADOPTS the stipulation [Doc. 9] . Defendant SHALL respond to the Complaint on or before June 24, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/11/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Tue 06/11 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Mallory H. Gantt is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Mallory Gnatt) (CAT)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/10 9:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Walter & Mason Retail, Inc.. (Price, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Wed 05/22 12:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Cowan. Walter & Mason Retail, Inc. served on 5/20/2024.(Burkhalter, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certified Mail - Proof of delivery
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 04/05 4:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. It is hereby ORDERED that this case isREASSIGNED to the Honorable Debra C. Poplin, United States Magistrate Judge,Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/5/24. (KFB)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 04/05 10:51 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 4/5/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/05 4:00 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook no longer assigned to case. (KFB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/03 8:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Walter & Mason Retail, Inc.. (CNC)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Wed 04/03 8:14 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/3/24. (CNC)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Wed 04/03 8:13 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/3/24. (CNC)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Wed 04/03 8:12 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/3/24. (CNC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Walter & Mason Retail, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5638731.), filed by Jeremy Cowan.(Burkhalter, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/03 8:11 AM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (CNC)
Related: [-]