Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: John F Docherty
Case #: 0:24-cv-01121
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Postech Fashion, Inc.
Plaintiff
Michelle Love
Represented By
Shawn J Wanta
Wanta Thome PLC
contact info
Scott Moriarity
Wanta Thome PLC
contact info
Christopher E. Roberts
Butsch Roberts & Associates LLC
contact info
David T Butsch
Butsch Roberts & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 10/08 2:51 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/8/2024. (TJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
17 17 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Tue 07/30 11:20 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Michelle Love's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Michelle Love.(Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 07/30 11:18 AM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re12 Motion for Discovery filed by Michelle Love.(Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 07/30 11:18 AM
Declaration of Christopher Roberts in Support of12 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Michelle Love's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Michelle Love.(Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I
14 14 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 07/30 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Michelle Love's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Michelle Love.(Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 07/30 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION12 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Michelle Love's Motion for Expedited Discovery : Date and time to be determined. (Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Discovery Tue 07/30 11:09 AM
MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Michelle Love's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Michelle Love. (Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
11 11 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/26 1:52 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Michelle Love . (Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Thu 07/25 1:45 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 7/25/2024.(TJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/01 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Love. Postech Fashion, Inc. served on 6/26/2024, answer due 7/17/2024. (Wanta, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 8:19 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher E. Roberts for Michelle Love.; granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David T Butsch for Michelle Love. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 4/4/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
7 7 11 pgs order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 04/03 3:43 PM
ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. STANDING ORDER NO. 1:Procedural Requirements for Preliminary and Final Approval of Class Action Settlements. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 4/3/2024.(DMD)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 3:16 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David T. Butsch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10949773 filed by Michelle Love. (Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/03 9:53 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher E. Roberts. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10948029 filed by Michelle Love. (Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Tue 04/02 12:13 PM
(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing David T. Butsch, Christopher E. Roberts as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/02 12:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Postech Fashion, Inc. (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/02 12:08 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-1121 (JWB/JFD). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Postech Fashion, Inc. d/b/a Chicme (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10945449) filed by Michelle Love. Filer requests summons issued. (Moriarity, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet