New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:24-cv-02501
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
TPUSA, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew C Karter
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara Brown
Represented By
Evan M. Foulke
Foulke Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 11/07 10:51 AM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE THIS CAUSE, having come before the Court upon Plaintiff, Tamara Brown ("Plaintiff"), and Defendant, TPUSA, Inc., d/b/a Teleperformance USA's ("Defendant") Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, and the Court, being otherwise duly advised in the premises, hereby ORDERS AND ADJUDGES: 1. The above-styled action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2. The Clerk shall deny any pending Motions as moot; and 3. Each pa1iy shall bear their own attorneys' fees, expert fees, paralegals' fees, and costs, except as otherwise provided in the Parties' Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release. DONE AND ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/7/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 11/06 6:01 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by TPUSA, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 08/21 5:08 PM
ORDER The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Courts calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/21/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stay Wed 08/21 3:19 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay this case and adjourn all deadlines and conferences Re: Settlement in Principle, addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Andrew Karter dated August 21, 2024. Document filed by TPUSA, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Mon 08/05 5:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip M. Halpern: Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/5/2024. Counsel for all parties appeared by telephone. The Court granted defendant leave to move to dismiss for improper venue or, in the alternative, to transfer venue, and set the following briefing schedule: motion shall be served, not filed, by 8/26/2024; opposition shall be served, not filed, by 9/16/2024; reply shall be served by 9/23/2024; and all papers shall be filed on the reply date, 9/23/2024. The Court also directed that by 8/26/2024, the parties shall: (i) meet and confer regarding whether the case should be transferred to the Middle District of Florida; and (ii) either file an order and stipulation transferring the case or file a letter via ECF advising the Court when the parties had their meet and confer, the length of time of the meet and confer and if no agreement was reached confirm that defendant served its motion. (Court Reporter AT&T teleconference) (mf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
11 11 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/17 10:38 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:9 Letter filed by TPUSA, Inc. ENDORSEMENTApplication for a pre-motion conference granted. The conference is scheduled for 8/5/2024 at 4:00 p.m. and will be held by telephone. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 8/5/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.) (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/17/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Tue 07/16 2:58 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Evan M. Foulke, Esq. dated July 16, 2024 re: Response to defense counsel's July 9, 2024 letter request for a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Tamara Brown..(Foulke, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Tue 07/09 1:29 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Andrew C. Karter dated July 9, 2024 re: Letter to the Court Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by TPUSA, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/17 5:15 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Application granted. The time for defendant to answer or otherwise file a pre-motion letter is extended to July 17, 2024. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning transfer of the venue of this action to the Middle District of Florida and, in the event the parties agree to such transfer, shall by July 17, 2024 file an order and stipulation to that effect. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/17/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/17 11:00 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Andrew C. Karter dated June 17, 2024. Document filed by TPUSA, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/17 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C Karter on behalf of TPUSA, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 06/17 5:16 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: TPUSA, Inc. answer due 7/17/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/17 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TPUSA, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Document filed by Tamara Brown..(Foulke, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/03 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TPUSA, Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/03 9:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/03 9:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/03 9:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/02 3:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TPUSA, Inc. d/b/a Teleperformance USA, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Tamara Brown..(Foulke, Evan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/02 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Foulke, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against TPUSA, Inc. d/b/a Teleperformance USA. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29164923)Document filed by Tamara Brown..(Foulke, Evan)
Related: [-]