Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-40158

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Noah G Hillen
Case #: 8:24-bk-40163
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Millenkamp Family LLC
471 N 300 W
Jerome, ID 83338-5078
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
38 38 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 04/22 9:52 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for March Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
37 37 14 pgs misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 03/21 4:20 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for February Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
36 36 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 02/24 3:31 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for January Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
35 35 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Wed 01/22 4:57 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for December Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
34 34 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 12/24 11:38 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for November Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
33 33 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 11/25 3:48 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for October Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
32 32 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Thu 10/24 11:02 AM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for September Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
31 31 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Thu 10/03 2:21 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for August Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
30 30 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 08/30 5:05 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for July Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 08/30 5:03 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for July Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
28 28 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Mon 07/22 5:36 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for June Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
27 27 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Fri 06/21 2:35 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for May Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
26 26 misc Amended Schedule[s] Fri 05/31 2:45 PM
Amended Schedule[s] for Non-Individual A/B - Real Property Amount $0.00, Personal Property Amount $0.00,. Description of Amendment: Schedule A/B, Part 4 Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Roussell, Tirzah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
25 25 misc Monthly Operating Report (Ch.11/12) Tue 05/21 5:04 PM
Chapter 11/12 Monthly Operating Report for April Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
24 24 misc Signature page(s) Mon 04/29 1:39 PM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 13 Schedule[s],14 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury,16 Equity Security Holders
Friday, April 26, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 11:52 AM
Notice of Appearance by Tirzah R. Roussell Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Roussell, Tirzah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance by Zachary Fairlie Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Fairlie, Zachary)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance by John O'Brien Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (O'Brien, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance by Scott C Powers Filed by Creditor Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of attorney for Ag Funding SC II LLC and Conterra Holdings, LLC d/b/a Conterra Ag Capital as loan servicer and power of att. (Powers, Scott)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance by Sheila Rae Schwager Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
18 18 misc Corporate Resolution Statement Wed 04/24 10:09 AM
Corporate Resolution Statement Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/24 9:26 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 04/24 9:25 AM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities Wed 04/24 9:24 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC Related [+]. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
14 14 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Wed 04/24 9:23 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Schedule[s] (Not Amended) Wed 04/24 9:22 AM
Schedule[s] for Non-Individual A/B - Real Property Amount $0.00, Personal Property Amount $0.00, D - Amount $476,276,713.52, E/F - Priority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, NonPriority Unsecured Claims Amount $0.00, G, H, Statement of Financial Affairs,. Creditors are not being added to the list of creditors. Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Mikkilineni, Krystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 order Joint Administration Tue 04/16 10:23 AM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 8:24-bk-40158 with Member Case 8:24-bk-40163 Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2024. (kll)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/10 10:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
10 10 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 04/08 2:35 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/10/2024 at 09:00 AM (Mountain Time) via Teleconference. See Notice for info. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/9/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/11/2024.Government Proof of Claim Date 9/30/2024. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Fri 04/05 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Fri 04/05 10:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
7 7 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/03 3:32 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Signature page(s) Wed 04/03 3:31 PM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), Corrective Entry regarding signature page(s)
5 5 utility Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/03 10:03 AM
Set Deficiency Deadlines - Income and Expense Statement due 4/17/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due 4/17/2024. Corporate Resolution Statement due 4/17/2024. (ef)
Related: [-]
utility Corrective Entry - Signature Page(s) Wed 04/03 10:05 AM
Corrective Action: You are receiving this notice because the original signature page was not filed at the same time as the electronically filed document. Please file the signature page for page 4 of the Petition electronically through ECF. For further information/procedures, visit our website at www.id.uscourts.gov. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ef)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC
utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/03 10:08 AM
Corrective Action: Form 204 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Claims needs to be refiled separately under correct event code Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/8/2024. (ef)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 trustee Chapter 11 Guidelines Tue 04/02 3:57 PM
Chapter 11 Guidelines Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 04/02 2:35 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-40163 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8309569. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 motion Joint Administration Tue 04/02 2:11 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Millenkamp Family LLC (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/02 1:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Millenkamp Family LLC Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/16/2024.Balance Sheet Due 04/16/2024.Cash Flow Statement Due 04/16/2024.Certificate of Credit Counseling due 04/16/2024. Statement of Domestic Support due 04/16/2024.Employee Income Records due 04/16/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/16/2024.Initial Statement About an Eviction Judgment Against You (Form 101A) due 04/16/2024.Federal Income Tax Return Due 04/16/2024.Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 04/16/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2024. Schedule C due 04/16/2024. Schedule D due 04/16/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2024. Schedule G due 04/16/2024. Schedule H due 04/16/2024. Schedule I due 04/16/2024. Schedule J due 04/16/2024. Schedule J-2 due 04/16/2024. Schedules A/B-J due 04/16/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2024.Statement of Operations Due: 04/16/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]