Johnson v. Watson et al
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Danny C Reeves |
Referred: | P So |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00090 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 6:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
R Delgado
|
|
Defendant
Lakin Matthews
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Officer
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Watson
|
|
Plaintiff
Montrial D. Johnson
3840-A Kenesaw Drive
Lexington, KY 40515 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
7
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 9:26 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Within twenty-eight (28) days, Johnson is directed to file either an amended complaint or a response explaining why the Court should not take the steps described above. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/11/24.(JLM) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued/Reissued
Mon 04/08 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to R Delgado, Lakin Matthews, Elizabeth Watson and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service.(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 R. Delgado, | ||
Att: 2 Elizabeth Watson | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 04/05 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF FILING Summons by Montrial D. Johnson re1 Complaint(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Unknown Officer, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Delgado, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Watson, | ||
Att: 4 Summons 55472 | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Standing Order re: Disclosure of Contact Information
Tue 04/02 3:42 PM
STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. (KCF) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Pro Se Information Packet
Tue 04/02 3:40 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 Sample Caption | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/02 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $405; receipt number 500003416), filed by Montrial D Johnson, pro se.(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, Photos, | ||
Att: 2 List of Items Contained on USB, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Tue 04/02 3:37 PM
Conflict Check run. (KCF) |
||
utility
File Submitted
Tue 04/02 3:43 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:1 Complaint (KCF) |