Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-10853
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Mathew Randall Ishbia
Represented By
Amanda K. Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Andrew John Clopton
Jones Day
contact info
Jeffrey J. Jones
Jones Day - Detroit
contact info
Stephen Joseph Cowen
contact info
Rebekah B Kcehowski
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
SFS Holding Corp.
Represented By
Amanda K. Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Andrew John Clopton
Jones Day
contact info
Jeffrey J. Jones
Jones Day - Detroit
contact info
Stephen Joseph Cowen
contact info
Rebekah B Kcehowski
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
UWM Holdings Corporation
Represented By
Amanda K. Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Andrew John Clopton
Jones Day
contact info
Jeffrey J. Jones
Jones Day - Detroit
contact info
Stephen Joseph Cowen
contact info
Rebekah B Kcehowski
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Amanda K. Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Andrew John Clopton
Jones Day
contact info
Jeffrey J. Jones
Jones Day - Detroit
contact info
Stephen Joseph Cowen
contact info
Rebekah B Kcehowski
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Therisa D. Escue
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Billy R. Escue, Jr.
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kim Schelbe
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian P. Weatherill
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jill Jeffries
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth C. Morandi
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Singh
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
46 46 notice Appear* Thu 05/01 5:44 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion . **Please see notice for call information. (LHos)
Related: [-]
45 45 order Vacate Thu 05/01 5:43 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Vacating (ECF No. 44 ) Text-Only Order Granting Motion to File Unredacted Version. Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
44 44 order Order on Motion - Free Thu 05/01 8:10 AM
[VACATED PER ORDER DATED 5/1/2025] TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting (ECF No.24 ) Defendants' Motion to File Unredacted Version of Motion for Relief Under Rule 11 (ECF No.23 ). Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) Modified on 5/1/2025 (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/14 3:22 PM
REPLY to Response re38 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Cowen,
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Friday, January 24, 2025
42 42 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/24 7:12 PM
RESPONSE to38 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brandon C. Hubbard,
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits to Declaration of Brandon C. Hubbard,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Declaration of Nick Gibbons
Thursday, January 16, 2025
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/16 7:06 PM
REPLY to Response re31 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/16 7:04 PM
REPLY to Response re30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
39 39 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Mon 12/23 1:42 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING DEADLINES REGARDING DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (ECF NO.38 ). Reset Motion Deadlines as to38 Second MOTION for Sanctions: Response due by 1/24/2025 and Reply due by 2/14/2025 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
38 38 motion Sanctions Fri 12/13 5:22 PM
Second MOTION for Sanctions by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 A. Stricker Declaration,
Att: 3 S. Cowen Declaration,
Att: 4 Index of Exhibits to S. Cowen Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit A,
Att: 6 Exhibit B,
Att: 7 Exhibit C,
Att: 8 Exhibit D,
Att: 9 Exhibit E,
Att: 10 Exhibit F,
Att: 11 Exhibit G,
Att: 12 Exhibit H,
Att: 13 Exhibit I,
Att: 14 Exhibit J,
Att: 15 Exhibit K,
Att: 16 Exhibit L,
Att: 17 Exhibit M,
Att: 18 Exhibit N,
Att: 19 G. Todd Declaration,
Att: 20 Index of Exhibits to G. Todd Declaration,
Att: 21 Exhibit 1,
Att: 22 Exhibit 2,
Att: 23 Exhibit 3,
Att: 24 Exhibit 4
37 37 notice Notice - Other Fri 12/13 4:56 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants re: Filing Redacted Documents (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
36 36 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/12 9:56 PM
RESPONSE to31 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/12 6:47 PM
RESPONSE to30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
34 34 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Wed 10/30 1:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING DEADLINES REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS (ECF NOS.30 AND31 ). Reset Motion deadlines as to30 MOTION to Dismiss and31 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations: Responses due by 12/12/2024 and Replies due by 1/16/2025 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/28 7:49 PM
REPLY to Response re24 MOTION Leave to File Unredacted Motion for Sanctions re23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/28 7:46 PM
REPLY to Response re23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
31 31 motion Strike Tue 10/15 8:41 PM
MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A,
Att: 2 Appendix B,
Att: 3 Appendix C,
Att: 4 Appendix D,
Att: 5 Appendix E
30 30 motion Dismiss Tue 10/15 8:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11
Friday, October 11, 2024
29 29 respm Response to Motion Fri 10/11 7:13 PM
RESPONSE to24 MOTION Leave to File Unredacted Motion for Sanctions re23 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File an Unredacted Version of Motion for Relief Under Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. § 1927, and This Court's Inherent Powers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 10/11 6:29 PM
RESPONSE to23 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Relief Under Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. § 1927, and This Court's Inherent Powers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Nick Gibbons
Thursday, October 03, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/03 4:01 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying as Moot (ECF No.16 ) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. See Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed 8/30/2024 (ECF No.21 ). Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Stipulation and Order Thu 10/03 3:52 PM
ORDER SETTING PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE BRIEFS. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (Please see order for details) (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
25 25 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Mon 09/30 8:36 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Reset Motion Deadlines as to23 MOTION for Sanctions and24 MOTION Leave to File Unredacted Motion for Sanctions: Response due by 10/11/2024 and Reply due by 10/28/2024 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
24 24 motion Motion - Free Tue 09/17 7:31 PM
MOTION Leave to File Unredacted Motion for Sanctions re23 MOTION for Sanctions by UWM Holdings Corporation, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Chart of Citations
23 23 37 pgs motion Sanctions Tue 09/17 7:12 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by UWM Holdings Corporation, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A. Stricker Declaration,
Att: 2 S. Cowen Declaration,
Att: 3 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 19-1,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 19-2,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 27 Exhibit Exhibit 23,
Att: 28 Exhibit Exhibit 24,
Att: 29 Exhibit Exhibit 25,
Att: 30 Exhibit Exhibit 26,
Att: 31 Exhibit Exhibit 27,
Att: 32 Exhibit Exhibit 28,
Att: 33 Exhibit Exhibit 29,
Att: 34 Exhibit Exhibit 30,
Att: 35 Exhibit Exhibit 31,
Att: 36 Exhibit Exhibit 32,
Att: 37 Exhibit Exhibit 33,
Att: 38 Exhibit Exhibit 34,
Att: 39 Exhibit Exhibit 35,
Att: 40 Exhibit Exhibit 36,
Att: 41 Exhibit Exhibit 37,
Att: 42 Exhibit Exhibit 38,
Att: 43 Exhibit Exhibit 39,
Att: 44 Exhibit Exhibit 40,
Att: 45 Exhibit Exhibit 41,
Att: 46 Exhibit Exhibit 42,
Att: 47 Exhibit Exhibit 43,
Att: 48 Exhibit Exhibit 44,
Att: 49 Exhibit Exhibit 45
22 22 notice Notice - Other Tue 09/17 6:26 PM
NOTICE by UWM Holdings Corporation, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC Notice of Filing Redacted Documents (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
21 21 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Fri 08/30 5:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Appendix A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Appendix B
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
20 20 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/10 12:19 PM
STIPULATED ORDER TO ESTABLISH DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Complaint due by 8/30/2024. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
19 19 notice Appearance Wed 06/26 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Clopton on behalf of All Defendants. (Clopton, Andrew)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Appearance Wed 06/26 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda K. Rice on behalf of All Defendants. (Rice, Amanda)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance Wed 06/26 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah B Kcehowski on behalf of All Defendants. (Kcehowski, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
16 16 60 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 06/21 8:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - UWM Wholesale Broker Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Hunterbrook Media Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Schelble's Closing Disclosures,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Weatherill's Mortgage Loan Origination Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' Anti-Steering Disclosures with Certificates,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs' Mortgage Contracts,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Weatherill's Closing Disclosure,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Escue's Closing Disclosure
Friday, June 14, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 06/14 9:21 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File (ECF No.11 ). The Court accepts the Supplemental Statement as filed; and notes each Party's position on the potential related case. Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 order Stipulation and Order Tue 06/11 4:56 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ESTABLISH PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFS. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
13 13 notice Notice - Other Thu 05/30 1:48 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants re: Acceptance and Acknowledgement of Service (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
12 12 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/15 10:00 AM
RESPONSE to11 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Statement Regarding Their Responses to the Civil Cover Sheet Relating to LR 83.11 filed by All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 11 pgs motion Leave to File Mon 05/13 9:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Statement Regarding Their Responses to the Civil Cover Sheet Relating to LR 83.11 by All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 notice Notice - Other Thu 05/02 4:55 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants re: Potential Related Case (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
9 9 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 04/22 5:33 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UWM Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent SFS Holding Corp., Other Affiliate United Wholesale Mortgage LLC d/b/a UWM, a Michigan corporation for UWM Holdings Corporation. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 04/22 5:32 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by SFS Holding Corp. identifying Other Affiliate United Wholesale Mortgage LLC d/b/a UWM, a Michigan corporation, Other Affiliate UWM Holdings Corporation for SFS Holding Corp.. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 04/22 5:30 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent UWM Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent SFS Holding Corp. for United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
6 6 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/18 3:40 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ESTABLISH DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Responsive pleading due by 6/24/2024 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 04/15 6:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joseph Cowen on behalf of All Defendants. (Cowen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Mon 04/15 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Jones on behalf of All Defendants. (Jones, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
3 3 order Reassignment/Disqualification Thu 04/04 9:59 AM
ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued* Wed 04/03 10:48 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Mathew Randall Ishbia, SFS Holding Corp., UWM Holdings Corporation, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC* (JHea)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 04/03 10:49 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JHea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
1 1 107 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 04/02 5:42 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9735583 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]