Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Case #: 7:24-cv-00094
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Wed 11/06 11:32 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
Related: [-]
9 9 12 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Certificate of Appealability Wed 11/06 11:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Certificate of Appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
8 8 misc State Court Records Tue 07/02 12:41 PM
State Court Records Filed.(Brodbeck, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 RR_DA01_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 2 2 RR_DA02_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 3 3 RR_DA03_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 4 4 RR_DA04_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 5 5 RR_DA05_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 6 6 RR_DA06_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 7 CR_DA07_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 8 Dir. App._Mandate_DA11_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 9 Dir. App_App't Br_DA08_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 10 Dir. App_Opinion_DA10_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 11 Dir. App_PDR_DA12_11-07-051-CR,
Att: 12 Dir. App_State Br_DA09_11 07-00051 CR,
Att: 13 Dir. App_status given_DA14_PD-0226-09,
Att: 14 Dir. App_status req_DA13_PD-0226-09,
Att: 15 SHCR-01 action taken sheet_SH02_WR-84,588-01, 3 30-2016
Att: 16 SHCR-01_SH01_WR-84,588-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 2 4-2016
Att: 17 SHCR-02 [MISC. I]_SH04_WR-84,588-02, RECD PRO SE 3 25-2019
Att: 18 SHCR-02 [MISC. II]_SH05_WR-84,588-02, RECD OTH 4 3-2019
Att: 19 SHCR-02 action taken sheet_SH06_WR-84,588-02, 5 15-2019
Att: 20 SHCR-02_SH03_WR-84,588-02, 3 25-2019
Att: 21 SHCR-03 [SUPP. I]_SH08_WR-84-588-03, Applct. Objs, 10 19-2023
Att: 22 SHCR-03 [SUPP. II]_SH09_WR-84,588-03, Amended FFCL, 10 23-2023
Att: 23 SHCR-03, action taken ntc._SH10_WR-84,588-03, 12 06-2023
Att: 24 SHCR-03, pp. 1-154_SH07_WR-84,588-03, 10-3-2023_Part1,
Att: 25 SHCR-03, pp. 155-271_SH07_WR-84,588-03, Applct. Exhibs. 10-3-2023_Part2,
Att: 26 SHCR-03, pp. 272-414_SH07_WR-84,588-03, Applct. Br., FFCL, 10-3-2023_Part3,
Att: 27 SHCR-03, pp. 415-541_SH07_WR-84,588-03, FFCL, trl recrd, 10-3-2023_Part4,
Att: 28 SHCR-03, pp. 542-688_SH07_WR-84,588-03, trl recrd,10-3-2023_Part5,
Att: 29 SHCR-03, pp. 689-784_SH07_WR-84,588-03, trl recrd, 10-3-2023_Part6,
Att: 30 SHCR-03, pp. 785-1043_SH07_WR-84,588-03, trl recrd, Judge Darr aff, 10-3-2023_Part7,
Att: 31 SHCR-03, pp. 1044-1291_SH07_WR-84,588-03, DA and Belazie aff, Petty aff., 10-3-2023_Part8,
Att: 32 SHCR-03, pp. 1292-1329_SH07_WR-84,588-03, State's Br., Applct. Resp. 10-3-2023_Part9
7 7 answer Answer to Amendment Tue 07/02 11:30 AM
Respondent's ANSWER to5 AMENDED With Brief in Support by Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID.(Brodbeck, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/10 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lori Brodbeck on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID. Attorney Lori Brodbeck added to party Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID(pty:res) (Brodbeck, Lori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 cmp Amendment Thu 04/04 9:53 AM
AMENDMENT to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID amending1 , filed by Samuel Sanchez, Jr..(Blizzard, Jacob)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/04 8:23 AM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE AN ANSWER. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Wed 04/03 8:15 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to Sarah Durham. (je3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
2 2 misc Brief Tue 04/02 5:51 PM
BRIEF regarding1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Samuel Sanchez, Jr.. (Blizzard, Jacob)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/02 5:48 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ATXWDC-18601492), filed by Samuel Sanchez, Jr..(Blizzard, Jacob)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/03 8:07 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (je3)
Related: [-]