J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-13427
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-13427
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-13428 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC
433 Bergen Ave
Kearny, NJ 07032-3938 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Mon 04/29 4:43 PM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. (Holt, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 04/11 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Mon 04/08 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Charles M. Forman on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. (Forman, Charles) |
|
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Joint Administration - multi case
Mon 04/08 10:40 AM
Order on Motion For Joint Administration. Lead Case: 24-13427 Member Cases: 24-13428 24-13429 24-13430 24-13431 24-13432 24-13433 24-13434 24-13435 Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice.. (omf) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 04/07 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 04/04 6:05 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 6/11/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/30/2024. (rah) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 04/04 12:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David S. Catuogno on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. (Catuogno, David) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 04/04 12:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Caitlin Conklin on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. (Conklin, Caitlin) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 04/04 12:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Daniel M. Eliades on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. (Eliades, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/04 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Jerold C. Feuerstein on behalf of 1000 Frank E. Rogers 1 LLC and Frank E. Rodgers 2 LLC. (Feuerstein, Jerold) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 04/04 10:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jerold C. Feuerstein on behalf of 1000 Frank E. Rogers 1 LLC and Frank E. Rodgers 2 LLC. (Feuerstein, Jerold) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Wed 04/03 3:37 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-13427 24-13428 24-13429 24-13430 24-13431 24-13432 24-13433 24-13434 24-13435 Filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. (Holt, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 04/02 8:21 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Stacey L. Meisel added to the case. (LVJ) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/02 7:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of J Supor 136-1 Realty LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/31/2024. (Holt, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Tue 04/02 8:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-13428 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46587069, fee amount $ 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |