Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:24-cv-00412
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2024 7:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Displayit Holdings, LLC
Represented By
J. Timothy Mast
contact info
James Harry Stone Levine
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP
contact info
Tyler Robert Wilson
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Defendant
PGEX Acquisition, LLC
Represented By
J. Timothy Mast
contact info
James Harry Stone Levine
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP
contact info
Tyler Robert Wilson
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff
Exhibits USA, Inc.
Represented By
Madeline Silverman
Gordon Fournaris & Mammarella PA
contact info
Geoffrey Boylston
Gordon, Fournaris & Mammarella
contact info
Neil Raymond Lapinski
Gordon, Fournaris & Mammarella
contact info
Plaintiff
James P. McGrath
Represented By
Madeline Silverman
Gordon Fournaris & Mammarella PA
contact info
Geoffrey Boylston
Gordon, Fournaris & Mammarella
contact info
Neil Raymond Lapinski
Gordon, Fournaris & Mammarella
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/02 9:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Exhibits USA, Inc., James P. McGrath. (Boylston, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Civil Tue 07/02 11:08 AM
CASE CLOSED (jaa)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
17 17 order Order Fri 06/07 8:59 AM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the Notice of Settlement (D.I. 16), the Court is pleased to hear that the parties have reached a settlement of all claims between them in this matter and need 60 days for the parties to draft and execute the necessary settlement documents and file the stipulation of dismissal with the Court. The Court HEREBY GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to vacate all pending deadlines and scheduled hearings in this matter. The Court also DENIES as MOOT (and without prejudice) all pending motions in this matter. The Court HEREBY ORDERS the parties to file the stipulation of dismissal on or before August 6, 2024. Ordered by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/7/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 06/05 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC (Levine, James Harry)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
15 15 misc Redacted Document Fri 05/24 1:13 PM
REDACTED VERSION of14 Order,6 Exhibit to a Document Complaint by Exhibits USA, Inc., James P. McGrath.(Boylston, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Exhibit A
Thursday, May 23, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/23 9:31 AM
ORDER re10 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibit A Under Seal filed by James P. McGrath, Exhibits USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/23/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/23 9:49 AM
SO ORDERED, re12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Timothy Mast filed by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/23/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/23 9:51 AM
SO ORDERED, re11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise move in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to June 5, 2024 filed by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/23/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 05/23 4:42 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney J. Timothy Mast for Displayit Holdings, LLC and PGEX Acquisition, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
13 13 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 05/22 10:40 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for J. Timothy Mast. ( re12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Timothy Mast )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4412822).(Levine, James Harry)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/22 10:35 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Timothy Mast - filed by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC.(Levine, James Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certification of J. Timothy Mast, Esq.
11 11 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 05/22 10:08 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise move in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to June 5, 2024 - filed by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC. (Levine, James Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/21 6:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibit A Under Seal - filed by Exhibits USA, Inc., James P. McGrath.(Lapinski, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Redacted Complaint,
Att: 3 Redacted Exhibit A
Thursday, May 09, 2024
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/09 8:22 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Plead or otherwise move in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to May 22, 2024 filed by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/9/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 05/08 3:38 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Plead or otherwise move in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to May 22, 2024 - filed by Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC. (Levine, James Harry)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/08 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Robert Wilson on behalf of Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC (Wilson, Tyler)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/08 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Harry Stone Levine on behalf of Displayit Holdings, LLC, PGEX Acquisition, LLC (Levine, James Harry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
6 6 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 04/24 1:43 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT A re 1 Complaint by Exhibits USA, Inc., James P. McGrath. (oam)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/24 1:46 PM
Remark: Exhibit A From the Complaint Removed and Refiled as Under Seal per Counsel's Request. (oam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/18 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Exhibits USA, Inc., James P. McGrath.PGEX Acquisition, LLC served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Lapinski, Neil)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/18 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Exhibits USA, Inc., James P. McGrath.Displayit Holdings, LLC served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Lapinski, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/03 12:05 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 04/02 10:43 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Exhibits USA, Inc.. (Lapinski, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 04/02 8:24 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Displayit Holdings, LLC, and PGEX Acquisition, LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4374442.) - filed by Exhibits USA, Inc. and James P. McGrath. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Tue 04/02 8:29 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mkr)
Related: [-]
service No Summons Issued Tue 04/02 8:30 AM
No Summons Issued. (mkr)
Related: [-]