New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-04485
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
SNOW JOE, LLC
Represented By
JEFFREY A. COOPER
Rabinowitz, Lubetkin & Tully, LLC
contact info
Notice Only
nefldw
Notice Only
PHV BENJAMIN FOLSOM
Notice Only
PHV JESSE O'NEILL
Plaintiff
PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By
JOHN E. MACDONALD
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
DANIELLE ELIZABETH ACOCELLA
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 1:49 PM
Set Deadlines as to28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/10 4:47 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC..(MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Notice of Non-Objection from Defendant,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 4 Declaration of Robert Wheeler,
Att: 5 Exhibit Proposed Form of Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
27 27 order Text Order Mon 01/06 2:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: Per the parties' request, they may provide a final update as to a possible resolution of this action on or before January 10, 2025. Should the parties fail to reach a resolution by that time, plaintiff may file its motion for summary judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/6/25. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
26 26 order Text Order Thu 01/02 3:19 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of the parties' update regarding their attempt to consensually resolve this matter and obviate plaintiff's contemplated motion for summary judgment. The parties are directed to provide a further update on or before January 3, 2025. Should the parties fail to reach a resolution by that time, plaintiff may file its motion for summary judgment on or before January 10, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/2/2025. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
25 25 order Text Order Mon 11/25 1:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed with the Court at the November 25, 2024 status conference, the parties shall engage in an informal resolution process, prior to defendants' filing a motion for summary judgment. Counsel shall provide a status report to the Court as to the outcome of this process on or before December 19, 2024 by sending a letter or email update to LDW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov. If the matter cannot be resolved consensually, defendants are granted leave to file their motion for summary judgment on or before January 10, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/25/24. (LM, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 11/25 4:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 11/25/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Wed 11/20 3:43 PM
Letter from Defendant, Snow Joe LLC re21 Scheduling Order. (COOPER, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Mon 11/18 3:01 PM
Letter from (Plaintiff) John E. MacDonald re21 Scheduling Order. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
22 22 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 10/30 12:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference set for November 21, 2024 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre is hereby rescheduled to November 25, 2024 at 12:30 p.m. Dial-in information for the conference is (973) 437-5535, access code 413 271 375#. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/30/24.(LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/09 3:59 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/9/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Fri 09/06 12:42 PM
STATUS REPORT by SNOW JOE, LLC. (COOPER, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 08/12 10:27 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JESSE O'NEILL and BENJAMIN FOLSOM, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
19 19 order Text Order Thu 08/08 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status letter on or before September 6, 2024, indicating whether they will continue to attempt to consensually resolve this action. If the parties instead reach impasse as to a resolution, defendant shall indicate whether it contends that discovery is necessary before plaintiff files its proposed dispositive motion and if so, shall submit a proposed discovery schedule. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/8/24. (LM, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 08/08 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 8/8/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 08/01 12:47 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jesse J. O'Neill to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 08/01 12:45 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Benjamin B. Folsom to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Tue 07/23 4:39 PM
Letter from John E. MacDonald. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 07/23 2:49 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee for JESSE J. O'NEILL: $ 250, receipt number NEW50571 (jr)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 07/23 2:55 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee for BENJAMIN B. FULSOM: $ 250, receipt number NEW50568 (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
15 15 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/22 1:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: This action having come before the Court for a Rule 16 conference on July 22, 2024, and the action concerning a debt that plaintiff contends is indisputably due and owing, and defense counsel needing more time to explore whether his client will pursue defenses to plaintiff's claim, the Court hereby schedules a telephone status conference before the undersigned on August 8, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. to discuss the parties' progress in reaching an early resolution of the action. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. To the extent plaintiff will seek leave to file an early summary judgment motion if the case is not resolved in the next few weeks, plaintiff's counsel shall file a letter seeking pre-motion leave that explains why a pre-discovery summary judgment motion would be appropriate in this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/22/24. (LM, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 07/22 12:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/22/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
14 14 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 07/18 2:34 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC..(MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/10 4:23 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of JESSE J. O'NEILL and BENJAMIN B. FULSOM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/10/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/10 12:56 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC..(MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of John E. MacDonald, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification of Benjamin B. Folsom, Esq.,
Att: 3 Certification of Jessie J. O'Neill, Esq.,
Att: 4 Exhibit to O'Neill Certification (suspension),
Att: 5 Exhibit to O'Neill Certification (reinstatement),
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 30, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 05/30 3:20 PM
NOTICE & ORDER regarding withdrawal of Attorney DANIELLE ELIZABETH ACOCELLA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/30/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 10:40 PM
NOTICE by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC. of Withdrawal of Attorney (ACOCELLA, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. MACDONALD on behalf of PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 05/28 11:37 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
8 8 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 05/24 11:20 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/24/24. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/23 1:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SNOW JOE, LLC.(COOPER, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 05/14 11:53 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document6 submitted by SNOW JOE, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/23/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 05/09 12:04 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant's Time to Answer Complaint. Attorney JEFFREY A. COOPER for SNOW JOE, LLC added. (COOPER, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/25 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC.. SNOW JOE, LLC served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. (ACOCELLA, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
qc QC - Disclosure Statement filed as an Attachment Mon 04/15 3:16 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The2 Diversity Disclosure Statement filed by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC. on 4/2/2024 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement. In the future, the Corporate Disclosure Statement must be filed separately using the Corporate Disclosure Event found under Other Documents. No further action is necessary as the Clerk's Office has filed the document using the correct event. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/12 3:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SNOW JOE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/03 1:45 PM
Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/15 3:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC. (ams, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/02 8:53 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC.. (ACOCELLA, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 8:51 PM
COMPLAINT against SNOW JOE, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15243931), filed by PROAMPAC HOLDINGS INC..(ACOCELLA, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet