Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas L Saladino
Case #: 8:24-bk-80279
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Carlisle Senior Living, LLC
PO Box 1227
Larry Williams
Idyllwild, CA 92549-1227
Represented By
Patrick Raymond Turner
Turner Legal Group, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Jerry L. Jensen
Acting United States Trustee Roman L. Hruska U.S. Trustee 111 S. 18th Plaza, Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Friday, June 21, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case 9 11 12 Fri 06/21 4:38 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (kks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/05 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Monday, June 03, 2024
20 20 audio Mon 06/03 3:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/3/2024 8:58:39 AM ]. File Size [ 1548 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:27 ]. (CRTclerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Dismiss Case Mon 06/03 9:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Related [+]. Hearing held June 3, 2024. Patrick Turner appeared for Debtor. Amy Blackburn appeared for U.S. Trustee. For the reasons stated on the record, the case is dismissed. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (See PDF) (dkk)
Related: [-] 15
Sunday, May 26, 2024
18 18 answer Objection Sun 05/26 7:05 PM
Objection Filed by Debtor Carlisle Senior Living, LLC Related [+] (Turner, Patrick)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Fri 05/10 11:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
16 16 court Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Wed 05/08 1:15 PM
Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2024 at 09:00 AM at Omaha Courtroom-Telephonic Hearing. Objections due by 5/24/2024. (See PDF) (mpm)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Wed 05/08 10:43 AM
Motion to Dismiss For Other Reasons Filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen (Blackburn, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
trustee Meeting of Creditors Held Thu 05/02 3:24 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held Related [+]. (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
14 14 court Entry - Re: Withdrawal Wed 05/01 9:27 AM
Court Entry Related [+]. No action will be taken by the court on the related pleading due to the filing of the withdrawal. Any associated hearing and/or deadlines have been terminated. (Text Only Entry) (mpm)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
13 13 misc Withdrawal Tue 04/30 4:23 PM
Withdrawal Filed by Amy Blackburn on behalf of Jerry L. Jensen. Related [+] (Blackburn, Amy)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 18 pgs misc Schedule A/B Mon 04/29 4:34 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner on behalf of Carlisle Senior Living, LLC. (Turner, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Wed 04/24 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline
Monday, April 22, 2024
10 10 court Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Mon 04/22 4:10 PM
Notice Setting Objection/Resistance Deadline Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 09:00 AM at Lincoln Courtroom-Telephonic Hearing. Objections due by 5/13/2024. (See PDF) (mpm)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
9 9 motion Dismiss Case Mon 04/22 1:09 PM
Motion to Dismiss For Failure to File Documents under Section 521 Filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen (Blackburn, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/11 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Camille R. Hawk on behalf of Newport Blue Impact LP. (Hawk, Camille)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 04/08 2:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation filed by U.S. Trustee Jerry L. Jensen
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/04 12:59 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-80279 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A9177641, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 court Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee Wed 04/03 3:38 PM
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee Related [+]. Notice Fee 14 Day Deadline due by 4/17/2024. (kks)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Carlisle Senior Living, LLC
4 4 trustee UST Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation Wed 04/03 2:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2024 at 01:30 PM BY PHONE. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/1/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 6/11/2024. (Jensen, Jerry)
Related: [-]
3 3 trustee UST Entry of Appearance Wed 04/03 11:22 AM
UST Entry of Appearance Filed by Amy Blackburn on behalf of Jerry L. Jensen. (Blackburn, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/03 9:31 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner on behalf of Carlisle Senior Living, LLC . EXTRACTED FROM #1 TO PROPERLY REFLECT ON THE DOCKET. (kks)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/02 4:20 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2024. Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner of Turner Legal Group, LLC on behalf of Carlisle Senior Living, LLC.(Turner, Patrick)
Related: [-]