Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00304
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 3:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.
Represented By
Victor N Corpuz
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kelsey Renee Sherman
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Western Governors University
Represented By
Victor N Corpuz
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kelsey Renee Sherman
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara A. LeCesne
STAFFORD MOORE, PLLC 325 N. St. Paul Street Ste. 2210
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Paul K Stafford
Stafford Moore PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
32 32 respm Response/Objection Fri 04/25 1:36 PM
RESPONSE filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. re:30 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Objection & Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 04/23 11:26 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Plaintiff's Objection and Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement. ECF No.30 . The Court ORDERS Defendants to file a response, detailing why Defendants oppose granting leave to file Plaintiff's Response. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave no later than April 25th, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/23/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 motion Leave to File Tue 04/22 9:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Objection & Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Barbara A. LeCesne (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response/Objection Tue 04/22 3:01 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Barbara A. LeCesne re:24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 10, 2025
28 28 misc Status Report Thu 04/10 4:00 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT (Second) Regarding Mediation filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
27 27 motion Sanctions Fri 04/04 6:09 PM
MOTION for Sanctions filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E
Monday, March 31, 2025
26 26 respm Appendix in Support Mon 03/31 9:50 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. re25 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F
25 25 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 03/31 9:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/31 9:46 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
23 23 trial Pretrial Disclosures Mon 03/31 1:29 PM
Pretrial Disclosures filed by Barbara A. LeCesne. (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 03/13 4:54 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants'21 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Complete Mediation. Noting that the Motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The deadline for the Parties to complete mediation is extended to Friday, April 18, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/13/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/12 8:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 misc Status Report Wed 03/12 6:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediation filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 03/05 5:05 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to file a mediation report, signed by counsel of each party, detailing (1) the date on which the mediation was held, (2) the persons present (including the capacity of any representative), and (3) a statement informing the Court of the effect of their mediation and whether this case has been settled by agreement of the parties on or before March 12, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/5/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 trial Designation of Experts Fri 01/10 5:47 PM
Designation of Experts by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
17 17 trial Designation of Experts Fri 12/13 3:41 PM
Designation of Experts by Barbara A. LeCesne. (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/05 3:09 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is parties' Joint Motion for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Expert Designation and Report Deadline (ECF No.14 ), and Motion to Extend Time of Expert Designation and Report Deadline (ECF No.15 ). The Court finds good cause to GRANT the extension. Accordingly, the Court EXTENDS the deadline to designate initial experts to December 13, 2024 and similarly EXTENDS the deadline to designate responsive experts to January 10, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/5/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/04 9:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Expert Designation & Report Deadlines filed by Barbara A. LeCesne (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Wed 12/04 9:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Expert Designation & Report Deadlines filed by Barbara A. LeCesne (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/19 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2024. Motions due by 3/31/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/29/2025. Discovery due by 2/28/2025. Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2025. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning July 28, 2025. Counsel and the parties shall be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during this four-week period. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/19/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 09/16 4:22 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 08/20 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelsey Renee Sherman on behalf of Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sherman, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 08/20 10:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
9 9 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Tue 08/20 9:58 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before September 17, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/20/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 5:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Victor N Corpuz added to party Western Governors University(pty:dft), Attorney Victor N Corpuz added to party Western Governors University - Texas, Inc.(pty:dft) (Corpuz, Victor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Returned Wed 08/07 12:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Returned Fri 07/12 5:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Returned Fri 07/12 4:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Barbara A. LeCesne. Waiver sent on 7/12/2024. (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 9:34 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to provide proof of service as to each Defendant in accordance with Rule 4 no later than July 12, 2024. Alternatively, Plaintiff must demonstrate good cause for her delay or file a motion for alternative service by July 12, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/3/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 4 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 04/03 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Western Governors University, Western Governors University - Texas, Inc. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
2 2 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Wed 04/03 9:57 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/02 10:37 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Barbara A. LeCesne. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14510697) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stafford, Paul)
Related: [-]