Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt v. Faith Inspirational Church et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02524 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
7-Eleven
|
|
Defendant
77th St Community Police Station
|
|
Defendant
Agios Nikolaos, Crete
|
|
Defendant
Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians
|
|
Defendant
Air National Guard
|
|
Defendant
India Aire
|
|
Defendant
Amazon Trucking and Distribution
|
|
Defendant
Angels Landing
|
|
Defendant
Apple Bees
|
|
Defendant
Athens, Greece
|
|
Defendant
Blue Mosque
|
|
Defendant
Body London
|
|
Defendant
Bonartza Productions
|
|
Defendant
David Lawrence Brewster, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Queen Naija Bulls
|
|
Defendant
CP Trucking Transporters Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cadillac Motor Company
|
|
Defendant
Cal Polytech
|
|
Defendant
Carters Family Cleaning
|
|
Defendant
Cash Money Records
|
|
Defendant
Dwayne Michael Caster, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Cathedral City
|
|
Defendant
Champagne Cattier
|
|
Defendant
Barbican Certre
|
|
Defendant
Church of Intercession
|
|
Defendant
Circle K
|
|
Defendant
Alexander Paul Coe
|
|
Defendant
Common
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Ballots
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Champeon
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Contest
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Izo
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Landivy
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Saints Mars-sur Colmont
|
|
Defendant
Commune of St-Mars-sur-la-Futaie
|
|
Defendant
Commune of Trans
|
|
Defendant
Compton Renaissance Transit
|
|
Defendant
Cross Crown Church
|
|
Defendant
Crypto.com
|
|
Defendant
Tracy Lynn Curry
|
|
Defendant
Nasir bin Olu Dara Jones
|
|
Defendant
Dax
|
|
Defendant
Denmark
|
|
Defendant
Department of Veterans Affairs
|
|
Defendant
Detroit Lions
|
|
Defendant
Dinosaur Caves Park
|
|
Defendant
Doggy Style Records
|
|
Defendant
Duke of Kent
|
|
Defendant
Elecktra Records
|
|
Defendant
England National Foorball Team
|
|
Defendant
Ethiopian Evangelical Church McKane Yesna
|
|
Defendant
Faith Inspirational Church
|
|
Defendant
Colin Farrell
|
|
Defendant
Fatih, Turkey
|
|
Defendant
Ford Island
|
|
Defendant
Foster Partners
|
|
Defendant
Foumenical Patriarchate
|
|
Defendant
Free State of Saxony
|
|
Defendant
Joanne Froggart
|
|
Defendant
GWB McFarlane Theatres
|
|
Defendant
Galata Tower
|
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
|
|
Defendant
General Electric Healthcare Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Gothenburg
|
|
Defendant
Grace Communion International
|
|
Defendant
Pamela Graves
|
|
Defendant
Greek Orthodox Patriarchate of Alexandria
|
|
Defendant
Toreney Ivy Hatcher, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Here East
|
|
Defendant
Hi-Power Entertainment
|
|
Defendant
Honolulu, Hawaii
|
|
Defendant
Indio Hills Badland Trailhead
|
|
Defendant
Indio, Ca
|
|
Defendant
Istanbul University
|
|
Defendant
JP Morgan
|
|
Defendant
Jaguar Land Rover Limited,
|
|
Defendant
Vinicius Junior
|
|
Defendant
Kenney Marshall Company
|
|
Defendant
Kensington Temple
|
|
Defendant
Lil Kim
|
|
Defendant
Knight Transportation
|
|
Defendant
Liberty Bell Center
|
|
Defendant
Jerry Buddy Long, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles County Sheriff Department
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles County Sheriffs
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Depsenckney Lawyers Inc
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Refinery
|
|
Defendant
Louis Roederer Crystal Champagne
|
|
Defendant
Frank Marshall
|
|
Defendant
Matrix Production Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Matrix Productions
|
|
Defendant
Bryon Anthonty McCane, II
|
|
Defendant
Dylan Kwabena Mills
|
|
Defendant
Monarch Butterfly Grove
|
|
Defendant
Bayezid Mosque, II
|
|
Defendant
Beyazit Mosque
|
|
Defendant
NAS
|
|
Defendant
NBC Universal
|
|
Defendant
Nail on LA
|
|
Defendant
Nederlander Theatre
|
|
Defendant
Newsboys
|
|
Defendant
Olympic Athletic Center of Athens
|
|
Defendant
Osiris
|
|
Defendant
Palm Springs
|
|
Defendant
Park Theatre
|
|
Defendant
Parkwood Entertaiment
|
|
Defendant
Parlophone Records Limited
|
|
Defendant
Philadeliphia 76ers
|
|
Defendant
Miguel Jontel Pimentel
|
|
Defendant
Queen Alia International Airport
|
|
Defendant
Queen Naija Inc
|
|
Defendant
RedRoof Inn
|
|
Defendant
Redroofs Theatre School
|
|
Defendant
Regents Theological College
|
|
Defendant
John Glover Roberts , Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Roc Nation Sports Limited
|
|
Defendant
Roman Temple of Hercules
|
|
Defendant
Romelu Lukaku Bolingoli
|
|
Defendant
Royal Shakespeare Company
|
|
Defendant
Russian Orthodox Church
|
|
Defendant
Saint Petersburg
|
|
Defendant
Santa Claus Beach
|
|
Defendant
Saxon
|
|
Defendant
Signal Hill
|
|
Defendant
Sky Group Limited
|
|
Defendant
Smuggler
|
|
Defendant
Smugglers Cave
|
|
Defendant
Trey Songz
|
|
Defendant
Spirit Airlines
|
|
Defendant
Syrias Orthodox Church of Antioch
|
|
Defendant
TK Transport
|
|
Defendant
Tamale, Ghana
|
|
Defendant
Tata Motors Limited
|
|
Defendant
Tel-Aviv City Hall
|
|
Defendant
The Detroit Masonic Temple
|
|
Defendant
The Gherkin
|
|
Defendant
The Lodge of Edinburgh No. 1
|
|
Defendant
The Port of Los Angeles
|
|
Defendant
The State Bar of California
|
|
Defendant
Theatre Royal
|
|
Defendant
Thessaloniki, Greece
|
|
Defendant
Tidal
|
|
Defendant
Tidal Music AS
|
|
Defendant
Togo
|
|
Defendant
Tower of Faith Evandelistical Church
|
|
Defendant
Colin Trevorrow
|
|
Defendant
Trinity Church Peace Makers
|
|
Defendant
Miclah LeVar Troy
|
|
Defendant
Turkey National Football Team
|
|
Defendant
United Agents Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Vivendi SE
|
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Records
|
|
Defendant
Kate Winslet
|
|
Defendant
World Mark Indio
|
|
Defendant
Armand de Brignac
|
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt
12035 S Broadway No. K
Los Angeles, CA 90061 |
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)2 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (rolm) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed against Defendants7-Eleven, 77th St Community Police Station, Agios Nikolaos, Crete, Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians, Air National Guard, India Aire, Amazon Trucking and Distribution, Angels Landing, Apple Bees, Athens, Greece, Blue Mosque, Body London, Bonartza Productions, David Lawrence Brewster, Jr, Queen Naija Bulls, CP Trucking Transporters Inc., Cadillac Motor Company, Cal Polytech, Carters Family Cleaning, Cash Money Records, Dwayne Michael Caster, Jr, Cathedral City, Champagne Cattier, Barbican Certre, Church of Intercession, Circle K, Alexander Paul Coe, Common, Commune of Ballots, Commune of Champeon, Commune of Contest, Commune of Izo, Commune of Landivy, Commune of Saints Mars-sur Colmont, Commune of St-Mars-sur-la-Futaie, Commune of Trans, Compton Renaissance Transit, Cross Crown Church, Crypto.com, Tracy Lynn Curry, Nasir bin Olu Dara Jones, Dax, Denmark, Department of Veterans Affairs, Detroit Lions, Dinosaur Caves Park, Doggy Style Records, Duke of Kent, Elecktra Records, England National Foorball Team, Ethiopian Evangelical Church McKane Yesna, Faith Inspirational Church, Colin Farrell, Fatih, Turkey, Ford Island, Foster Partners, Foumenical Patriarchate, Free State of Saxony, Joanne Froggart, GWB McFarlane Theatres, Galata Tower, General Electric Company, General Electric Healthcare Technologies, Inc., Gothenburg, Grace Communion International, Pamela Graves, Greek Orthodox Patriarchate of Alexandria, Toreney Ivy Hatcher, Jr, Here East, Hi-Power Entertainment, Honolulu, Hawaii, Indio Hills Badland Trailhead, Indio, Ca, Istanbul University, JP Morgan, Jaguar Land Rover Limited,, Vinicius Junior, Kenney Marshall Company, Kensington Temple, Lil Kim, Knight Transportation, Liberty Bell Center, Jerry Buddy Long, Jr, Los Angeles County Sheriff Department, Los Angeles County Sheriffs, Los Angeles Depsenckney Lawyers Inc, Los Angeles Refinery, Louis Roederer Crystal Champagne, Frank Marshall, Matrix Production Inc., Matrix Productions, Bryon Anthonty McCane, II, Dylan Kwabena Mills, Monarch Butterfly Grove, Bayezid Mosque, II, Beyazit Mosque, NAS, NBC Universal, Nail on LA, Nederlander Theatre, Newsboys, Olympic Athletic Center of Athens, Osiris, Palm Springs, Park Theatre, Parkwood Entertaiment, Parlophone Records Limited, Philadeliphia 76ers, Miguel Jontel Pimentel, Queen Alia International Airport, Queen Naija Inc, RedRoof Inn, Redroofs Theatre School, Regents Theological College, John Glover Roberts, Jr, Roc Nation Sports Limited, Roman Temple of Hercules, Romelu Lukaku Bolingoli, Royal Shakespeare Company, Russian Orthodox Church, Saint Petersburg, Santa Claus Beach, Saxon, Signal Hill, Sky Group Limited, Smuggler(official capacity), Smugglers Cave, Trey Songz, Spirit Airlines, Syrias Orthodox Church of Antioch, TK Transport, Tamale, Ghana, Tata Motors Limited, Tel-Aviv City Hall, The Detroit Masonic Temple, The Gherkin, The Lodge of Edinburgh No. 1, The Port of Los Angeles, The State Bar of California, Theatre Royal, Thessaloniki, Greece, Tidal, Tidal Music AS, Togo, Tower of Faith Evandelistical Church, Colin Trevorrow, Trinity Church Peace Makers, Miclah LeVar Troy, Turkey National Football Team, United Agents Ltd, Vivendi SE, Walt Disney Records, Kate Winslet, World Mark Indio, Armand de Brignac Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi., filed by plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |