California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01305
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Jesus Gonzalez Lopez (1)
Represented By
Lewis Christian Muller
Lewis C Muller Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Keith D. Ellison
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2024 1:17 AM PDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Gonzalez Lopez (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jesus Gonzalez Lopez.(gac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Gonzalez Lopez: Initial Appearance set for 4/1/2024 before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jesus Gonzalez Lopez (cxl)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Gonzalez Lopez held on 4/1/2024. Appointed Attorney Lewis Christian Muller (n/a)for Jesus Gonzalez Lopez. Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 4/4/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/11/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Arraignment set for 4/25/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) (Interpreter Ariela Edelson Torenberg). (CD# 4/1/2024 VET 24-1:3:00-3:34). (Plaintiff Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Julian Bugarin FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Gonzalez Lopez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Jesus Gonzalez Lopez. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Jesus Gonzalez Lopez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 4/1/24. (aje)
Related: [-]