Pioneer Capital Anstalt v. Super League Enterprises, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Rearden |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02524 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 10:09 AM EDT |
All Defendants
Super League Enterprises, Inc.
|
|
All Plaintiffs
Pioneer Capital Anstalt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 04/22 1:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Super League Enterprises, Inc. served on 4/4/2024, answer due 4/25/2024. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks, Process Agent. Document filed by Pioneer Capital Anstalt..(Babnick, Richard) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 9:53 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Super League Enterprises, Inc. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/04 9:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Johnnie Babnick, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Pioneer Capital Anstalt, Super League Enterprises, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/04 9:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Johnnie Babnick, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 9:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 9:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 9:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 10:14 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Super League Enterprises, Inc. f/k/a Super League Gaming, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pioneer Capital Anstalt..(Babnick, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 10:12 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pioneer Capital Anstalt..(Babnick, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 10:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Babnick, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 10:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Super League Enterprises, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29167448)Document filed by Pioneer Capital Anstalt..(Babnick, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - First Subscription Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh B - Series AA Cert of Designation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh C - AIR Exercise Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh D - Second Subscription Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh E - Series AA2 Cert of Designation |