Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 4:24-bk-31523
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Dismissed:May 31, 2024
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sweet Spot Rentals, LLC
2809 Mason St
Houston, TX 77006-3131
Represented By
Michael L. Hardwick
Michael Hardwick Law, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Thursday, September 05, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/05 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Generic Order
Saturday, August 31, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Sat 08/31 8:58 AM
Order Denying Motion to Enforce Related [+] Signed on 8/31/2024. (trc4)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 motion Generic Motion Wed 08/28 1:01 PM
Motion to Enforce Filed by Trustee Jarrod B Martin Hearing scheduled for 9/25/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 08/13 9:57 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (trc4)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/19 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Application for Compensation
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order for Compensation Wed 07/17 7:53 AM
Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Granting for Jarrod B Martin, fees awarded: $1540.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Signed on 7/17/2024. (trc4)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, June 20, 2024
15 15 motion Compensation Thu 06/20 5:13 PM
Final Application for Compensation for Jarrod B Martin, Trustee Chapter 11, Period: 4/9/2024 to 5/31/2024, Fee: $1,540.50, Expenses: $0.00. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Attorney Jarrod B Martin Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Sunday, June 02, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/02 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 69. Notice Date 06/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 order Dismiss Case Fri 05/31 8:07 AM
Order Dismissing Case 4:24-bk-31523 Related [+] Signed on 5/31/2024. (trc4)
Related: [-] 10
Sunday, May 19, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/19 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 order Setting Hearing Fri 05/17 11:14 AM
Order Resetting Status Conference Signed on 5/17/2024 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 6/5/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (trc4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Case Mon 05/06 9:10 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause (Voluntary) . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor Sweet Spot Rentals, LLC Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (Hardwick, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 18, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 04/18 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 68. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/09 8:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jarrod B Martin Filed by on behalf of Jarrod B Martin (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs trustee Ch 11 Subch V Notice Appointing Trustee Tue 04/09 8:41 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Jarrod B Martin added to case as trustee. (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/09 8:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ha Minh Nguyen (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/05 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
8 8 trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING) Tue 04/16 10:00 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 7/5/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 6/12/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/30/2024. (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Wed 04/03 12:44 PM
Notice of Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations, and Profitability of Entities in which the Debtor's Estate Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest (Form 426) . Filed by Sweet Spot Rentals, LLC (Hardwick, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Wed 04/03 12:37 PM
Declaration re: Unsworn Declaration of Stefan Hollands Regarding § 1187(a) Filing Requirements. (Filed By Sweet Spot Rentals, LLC ). (Hardwick, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Setting Hearing Wed 04/03 11:42 AM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 4/3/2024 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 5/22/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (mar4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 04/03 9:05 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Sweet Spot Rentals, LLC. (Hardwick, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/03 9:21 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-31523 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25187359. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines Wed 04/03 11:44 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Related [+] Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/1/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2024. (mar4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)