Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lori S Simpson
Case #: 0:24-bk-12787
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 07, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2024

Debtor
Martinez Concrete, LLC
9114 Kinzer St
Lanham, MD 20706-4140
Represented By
Alan D. Eisler
Eisler Hamilton, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Laura J. Margulies
Laura Margulies, Trustee 401 North Washington Street Suite 500
Rockville, MD 20850


Docket last updated: 04/03/2024 12:03 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
crditcrd none Wed 04/03 11:06 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-12787 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A42050118. Fee amount 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Opening Wed 04/03 11:04 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Martinez Concrete, LLC. (Eisler, Alan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 04/03 11:04 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Alan D. Eisler. (Eisler, Alan)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Wed 04/03 11:19 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Margulies, Laura J. with 341(a)
Related: [-]