Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:24-cv-01131
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 3:30 AM CDT
Petitioner
Christian Alberto Mendez Menjivar
Represented By
Ruta Johnsen
Henschel Moberg, P.A.
contact info
Respondent
Fredis Donain Montoya Sanchez
216 North 6th Street
Montevideo, MN 56265
Respondent
Deisy Rosibel Enamorado Castro
Represented By
Eva Jean Rodelius Buer
Caso Law
contact info
David L Wilson
Wilson Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
93 93 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 09/24 10:44 AM
(Text-Only) TEXT ORDER: Based on the current status of this case, the parties most recently filed status reports, and because no good cause has been shown for having this case remain open, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case (Civ. No. 24-1131 (JWB/DTS)) is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Administrative closure is a docket-control device used by the Court for statistical purposes. After an administrative closure, the parties may file a motion to reopen the case at any time. Administrative closure will not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation in any manner. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 9/24/2024. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
92 92 misc Status Report Fri 09/20 4:26 PM
STATUS REPORT by Deisy Rosibel Enamorado Castro. (Wilson, David)
Related: [-]
91 91 misc Status Report Fri 09/20 2:51 PM
STATUS REPORT by Christian Alberto Mendez Menjivar. (Johnsen, Ruta)
Related: [-]