The Estate of Sarah Howard et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Angel Kelley |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10859 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts Land Court, 24 MISC 000128 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Freddie Mac
Brian C. Linehan, Esq. Doonan, Graves & Longoria LLC 100 Cummings Center, Ste. 303C
Beverly, MA 01915 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Brian C. Linehan, Esq. Doonan, Graves & Longoria LLC 100 Cummings Center, Ste. 303C
Beverly, MA 01915 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph L. Nelson
|
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Sarah Howard
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/29 1:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order,7 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Linehan, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A through P | ||
13 | 13
respm
Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/29 1:31 PM
Opposition re10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Linehan, Brian) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/29 1:29 PM
Opposition re7 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Linehan, Brian) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 1:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Linehan, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 04/11 3:30 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joseph L. Nelson, The Estate of Sarah Howard.(Lara, Miguel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order | ||
9 | 9
order
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 04/11 3:24 PM
DISREGARD District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Horvath, Courtney) Modified on 4/11/2024 - entered in error. (Lara, Miguel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 04/11 11:28 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Joseph L. Nelson, The Estate of Sarah Howard. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Lis Pendens
Thu 04/11 11:27 AM
EX-PARTE MOTION for Lis Pendens by Joseph L. Nelson, The Estate of Sarah Howard. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Wed 04/03 3:33 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 04/03 3:27 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/03 1:31 PM
NOTICE by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal Motions Pending (Linehan, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/03 1:26 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The Category form filed with the Notice of Removal indicates there are pending motions that need this court's attention. Please re-file any pending motions from State Court into this District Court Record. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 1:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Linehan, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/03 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Freddie Mac, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10348550 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Linehan, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |