Burkhard v. Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew J Maddox |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00968 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Check Point Software Technologies
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Burkhard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response
Tue 04/23 2:00 PM
RESPONSE re10 Miscellaneous Correspondence Joint Statement in Response To the Court's Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Check Point Software Technologies, Inc..(Dunham, Jordan) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
corresp
Miscellaneous
Wed 04/17 5:03 PM
Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Conference call details have been provided to the parties. (sj2s, Chambers) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/10 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Check Point Software Technologies, Inc..(Dunham, Jordan) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/10 9:29 AM
(FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to3 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Check Point Software Technologies, Inc..(Dunham, Jordan) Modified on 4/10/2024 (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response
Mon 04/08 11:12 AM
RESPONSE re4 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Check Point Software Technologies, Inc..(Teare, Teresa) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 12:29 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ryan Burkhard (Perkins, Marshall) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall N Perkins on behalf of Ryan Burkhard (Perkins, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions
Thu 04/04 8:55 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Check Point Software Technologies, Inc., filed by Ryan Burkhard.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet | ||
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 1:34 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Check Point Software Technologies identifying Corporate Parent Check Point Software Technologies, Ltd.,, Party with Financial Interest Zone Labs, L.L.C., Party with Financial Interest R&M Computer Consultants, Inc. for Check Point Software Technologies.(Dunham, Jordan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/03 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number C-15cv-24-000933. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11182595), filed by Check Point Software Technologies.(Dunham, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet US District Court Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Complaint Jury Trial Demand, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Jury Trial Demand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Writ of Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice of New Case Number, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Scheduling Notice and Order of Court, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Order for Pretrial Conference, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Envelope, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Docket, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal | ||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Thu 04/04 8:52 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (4) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |