The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02536 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Twin City Fire Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
The Travelers Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/11 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Starr, Petra) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 04/10 1:33 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, by April 24, 2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/10/2024) (vfr) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 10:35 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 10:31 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 10:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 10:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/03 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Petra Starr on behalf of The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Starr, Petra) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 1:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Starr, Petra) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 1:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Twin City Fire Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Starr, Petra) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 1:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Starr, Petra) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29169409)Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Starr, Petra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Underlying Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Bill of Particulars |