Zam v. Mizuho Americas Services, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02537 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes) |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Cheryl Benoit
|
|
Defendant
Steven Gatto
|
|
Defendant
Mizuho Americas Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Gabrielle Zam
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/09 11:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mizuho Americas Services, LLC waiver sent on 4/3/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/09 11:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Steven Gatto(in his individual capacity ) waiver sent on 4/3/2024, answer due 6/3/2024; Steven Gatto(in his professional capacities) waiver sent on 4/3/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/09 11:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Cheryl Benoit(in her professional capacities) waiver sent on 4/3/2024, answer due 6/3/2024; Cheryl Benoit(in her individual capacity ) waiver sent on 4/3/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/05 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/3/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/5/2024) (rro) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 12:28 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Gatto. (vf) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cheryl Benoit. (vf) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mizuho Americas Services, LLC. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/04 11:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Meredith Anne Firetog. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steven Gatto, Cheryl Benoit. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/04 12:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Meredith Anne Firetog. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes). (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 12:16 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 12:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 12:17 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/04 12:25 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Meredith Anne Firetog re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF in their professional capacities. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf) |
||
utility
Add Party for Pleading
Thu 04/04 12:43 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Cheryl Benoit, Steven Gatto added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by Gabrielle Zam. Related document:1 Complaint..(Firetog, Meredith) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 1:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Gatto, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 1:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cheryl Benoit, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 1:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mizuho Americas Services LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 1:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Firetog, Meredith) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Cheryl Benoit, Steven Gatto, Mizuho Americas Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29169447)Document filed by Gabrielle Zam..(Firetog, Meredith) |