Kendrick et al v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen K Caldwell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00091 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joelle Leaumont Kendrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Kendrick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order For Meeting and Report
Wed 04/10 3:05 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: W/in 21 days of this order, parties conduct meeting; NLT 14 days after meeting, file report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/10/24.(JLM) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
utility
File Submitted
Tue 04/09 8:59 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review:4 Answer to Complaint (JLM) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/08 1:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(Wardle, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Wed 04/03 9:11 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.. (KCF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/03 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bourbon Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00058. (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5806856), filed by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Notice of Filing of NOR, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Wed 04/03 9:08 AM
Conflict Check run. (KCF) |