Trimble v. American First Finance
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00969 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Prince George's County, C-16-CV-24-001059 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
American First Finance
8585 N. Stemmons Fwy Suite N-1000
Dallas, TX 75247 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaitlyn Trimble
418 Hillview Drive Apartment 304
Linthicum Heights, MD 21090 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 11:17 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bryan O. Balogh. Directing attorney Bryan O. Balogh to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 11:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Allyson R. Mancuso. Directing attorney Allyson R. Mancuso to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 8:01 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allyson Mancuso (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11196636.) by American First Finance(Farmer, Jessica) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 7:59 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bryan O. Balogh (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11196634.) by American First Finance(Farmer, Jessica) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/10 10:49 AM
ORDER granting9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint (or otherwise respond); Defendants response shall be filed on or before May 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/10/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/09 7:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint (or otherwise respond) by American First Finance(Farmer, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/09 7:40 PM
NOTICE by American First Finance re5 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (Farmer, Jessica) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 3:45 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kaitlyn Trimble (Carney, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 11:29 AM
NOTICE by American First Finance re1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover (Farmer, Jessica) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions
Thu 04/04 11:28 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 11:27 AM
State Court COMPLAINT against American First Finance, filed by Kaitlyn Trimble.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/04 11:17 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by American First Finance was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to 1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Thu 04/04 11:28 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 3:58 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American First Finance identifying Corporate Parent FirstCash Holdings, Inc. for American First Finance.(Farmer, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/03 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number C-16-CV-24-001059. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11182775), filed by American First Finance.(Farmer, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |