Buffington et al v. sPay, Inc. d/b/a Stack Sports
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02541 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
sPay, Inc. d/b/a Stack Sports
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Buffington
|
|
Plaintiff
Cyrinda Craig
|
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Helmold
|
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Kramer
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 2:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to sPay, Inc.. (vf) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 9:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to sPay, Inc. d/b/a Stack Sports, re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Buffington, Cyrinda Craig, Nancy Helmold, Sarah Kramer. |
|
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Wed 04/10 8:45 AM
Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for3 Complaint. Filing fee $ 405.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-29169966, paid on 4/3/2024..(jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/10 8:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Robert Reese. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to Orange; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/10 9:01 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Robert Reese. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steven Buffington; Nancy Helmold; Sarah Kramer; Cyrinda Craig; sPay, Inc. d/b/a Stack Sports. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/10 9:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 9:10 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 9:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 9:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Robert Reese to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; remove 'et al' from the PDF case caption; the filing must be linked to the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 12:27 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Steven Buffington, Cyrinda Craig, Nancy Helmold, Sarah Kramer. |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against sPay, Inc. d/b/a Stack Sports. Document filed by Cyrinda Craig, Steven Buffington, Sarah Kramer, Nancy Helmold. |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading
Thu 04/04 9:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Robert Reese to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/9/2024. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 2:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to sPay, Inc. d/b/a Stack Sports, re: Complaint. Document filed by Steven Buffington, Cyrinda Craig, Nancy Helmold, Sarah Kramer. |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 2:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. |