Chicago Title Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00973 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Action for Interplea |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Harford County, C-12-CV-24-000174 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Gate APG, LLC
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chicago Title Insurance Company
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/22 2:48 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America and U.S. Attorney General (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
18 | 18
corresp
Miscellaneous
Mon 04/22 2:13 PM
Correspondence re: Summons(Cohen, Yona) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
corresp
Miscellaneous
Thu 04/18 2:06 PM
Correspondence re: Summons(Cohen, Yona) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
15 | 15
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 12:27 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gate APG, LLC identifying Party with Financial Interest APG Investors, LLC for Gate APG, LLC.(Cathell, Dale) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/18 3:03 PM
QC NOTICE:16 Miscellaneous Correspondence was filed incorrectly. **Summons must also be provided for the U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Please file the completed summons using Notice(Other) and link to 16 . (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
notice
Deficiency Notice
Fri 04/12 8:31 AM
Deficiency Notice for Gate APG, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/19/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/12 8:27 AM
ORDER granting13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/11/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/11 4:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 Complaint by Gate APG, LLC(Cathell, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Kerbin Cathell on behalf of Gate APG, LLC (Cathell, Dale) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Wesley Reichart, III on behalf of Gate APG, LLC |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Local Rule
Wed 04/10 2:57 PM
Local Rule 103.5 Filing of Remaining State Court Papers(Shea, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Writ of Summons - Gate APG LLC (Maykrantz) as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 4 Writ of Summons - Gate APG LLC (Levine) as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 5 Writ of Summons - Sec. of Army as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 6 Writ of Summons - Sec of Defense as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service - Gate APG LLC (Maykrantz) as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 8 Affidavit of Service - USAO as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 9 Affidavit of Service - Sec of Defense as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 10 Affidavit of Service - Sec of Army as filed in State Court | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response
Wed 04/10 1:24 PM
RESPONSE re5 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by United States of America.(Shea, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 3:02 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Group Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial Inc. for Chicago Title Insurance Company.(Cohen, Yona) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 12:58 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cohen, Yona) Modified on 4/9/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 04/09 2:13 PM
QC NOTICE:6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **All entities listed on the form, must be entered into the system as a corporate parent, other affiliate or as having a financial interest in the litigation. Please refile and enter the parties when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions
Wed 04/03 3:34 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Gate APG, LLC, United States of America, filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/03 2:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America(Shea, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule
Wed 04/03 2:46 PM
Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Shea, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/03 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court for Harford County, Maryland, case number C-12-CV-24-000174., filed by United States of America.(Shea, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Case Information Sheet as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 5 - Complaint for Interpleader as filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 6 Writ of Summons to US as filed in State Court | ||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Wed 04/03 3:32 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT HARFORD COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |