Thompson v. Leverton et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02542 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Joseph Flinn
|
|
Defendant
Asher Genoot
|
|
Defendant
Alexia Hefti
|
|
Defendant
Michael Ho
|
|
Defendant
Jamie Leverton
|
|
Defendant
Stanley O'Neal
|
|
Defendant
Rick Rickertsen
|
|
Defendant
Mayo A. Shattuck, III
|
|
Defendant
Bill Tai
|
|
Defendant
Shenif Visram
|
|
Defendant
Amy Wilkinson
|
|
Nominal Defendant
Hut 8 Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Mon 04/29 9:54 AM
PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses his claims in the above-captioned action (the "Action"). No compensation in any form has passed directly or indirectly from any of the Defendants to Plaintiff or counsel for Plaintiff, and no promise to give any such compensation has been made. Defendants have filed neither an answer nor a motion for summary judgment in the Action. Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed this case under F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/27/2024) (rro) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/26 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Michael Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson. Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/23 3:47 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, the Court is inclined to transfer this case to the Southern District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). See 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) ("The district court of a district in which is filed a case laying venue in the wrong division or district shall dismiss, or if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district or division in which it could have been brought."). Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than April 30, 2024 as to why this action should not be transferred to the Southern District of Florida. In the alternative, if Plaintiff is willing to transfer this action to the Southern District of Florida, the Court requests that Plaintiff submit a letter stating that it consents to the transfer of this action to the Southern District of Florida no later than April 30, 2024. Plaintiff is also directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/23/2024) (ks) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 11:57 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hut 8 Corp. served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Service was accepted by Litigation Management Representative, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/05 2:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Michael Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Michael Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson. Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
utility
Case Declined as Not Related
Fri 04/05 2:00 PM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:24-cv-00904-VM and declined by Judge Victor Marrero and returned to wheel for assignment. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 04/05 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 2:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 10:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Thu 04/04 10:17 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:24-cv-00904. Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 9:41 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Michael Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 9:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Timothy William Brown to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect related case number is on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Related Case Statement
Thu 04/04 9:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Timothy William Brown to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; the incorrect related case number is listed on the docket text and the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/04 9:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy William Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 160 (Stockholders Suits);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 850 (Securities/Commodities);. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 9:37 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 9:39 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Thu 04/04 9:39 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Victor Marrero as possibly related to 24-cv-904. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Wed 04/03 3:29 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:24-cv-01636. Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 3:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAMIE LEVERTON, SHENIF VISRAM, JOSEPH FLINN, ASHER GENOOT, ALEXIA HEFTI, MICHAEL HO, STANLEY O' NEAL, RICK RICKERTSEN, MAYO A. SHATTUCK, III, BILL TAI, AMY WILKINSON, Hut 8 CORP., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 3:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
58
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Joseph Flinn, Asher Genoot, Alexia Hefti, Michael Ho, Hut 8 Corp., Jamie Leverton, Stanley O'Neal, Rick Rickertsen, Mayo A. Shattuck, III, Bill Tai, Shenif Visram, Amy Wilkinson. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29170282)Document filed by Jeffrey Thompson..(Brown, Timothy) |