Lowry et al v. Brumis Imports, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02544 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Brumis Imports, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
John Lowry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frieda Tawil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/09 12:31 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Brumis Imports, Inc. served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by John Lowry; Frieda Tawil..(Leslie, Alec) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 10:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brumis Imports, Inc...(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 10:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 10:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 10:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 3:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brumis Imports, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Lowry, Frieda Tawil..(Leslie, Alec) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 3:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leslie, Alec) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Brumis Imports, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29170509)Document filed by John Lowry, Frieda Tawil..(Leslie, Alec) |