PATEL v. B.M.J TOWING & RECOVERY INC.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02545 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441mv Removal- Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
All Defendants
B.M.J TOWING & RECOVERY INC.
GALLO VITUCCI & KLAR 90 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
All Plaintiffs
PRAGNESHKUMAR J. PATEL
DAVIS, SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON P.C. 225 Broadway, 3nd Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 4:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jayson, Sherri) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/04 10:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Sherri Anne Jayson re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add John Doe with party text 'same name being fictitious and unknown'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sherri Anne Jayson to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Jury Demand code was selected; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/04 10:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sherri Anne Jayson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Jury Demand code n (None);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 ; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant);. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/04 10:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sherri Anne Jayson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PRAGNESHKUMAR J. PATEL; B.M.J TOWING & RECOVERY INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 10:51 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 10:52 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 10:53 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
utility
Add Party for Pleading
Thu 04/04 4:42 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents B.M.J Towing & Recovery Inc. added. Party added pursuant to1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by B.M.J Towing & Recovery Inc., John Doe. Related document:1 Notice of Removal,..(Jayson, Sherri) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 4:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by B.M.J TOWING & RECOVERY INC...(Jayson, Sherri) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 4:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jayson, Sherri) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 04/03 4:13 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by B.M.J TOWING & RECOVERY INC..(Jayson, Sherri) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/03 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 812803/2023E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29171211).Document filed by B.M.J TOWING & RECOVERY INC...(Jayson, Sherri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Initial Discovery demands, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Response to Combined Demands |