Competello v. Ella + Mila, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Referred: | Gabriel W Gorenstein |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02547 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ella + Mila, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan Competello
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/05 2:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/5/24) (yv) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/05 12:44 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff alleges that Defendant's website is not accessible to blind and visually impaired customers and, thus, violates Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. § 12181 et seq. In the Court's experience, cases involving such claims almost always settle, often even before the initial pretrial conference. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. To be clear, the referral does not encompass any dispositive motions, which will be handled by the undersigned in the normal course. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/5/24) (yv) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 12:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ella + Mila, Inc...(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 12:06 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 12:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 12:07 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/03 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennitta Lisa Joseph on behalf of Susan Competello..(Joseph, Bennitta) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 4:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ella + Milla, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Susan Competello..(Norinsberg, Jon) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 4:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Norinsberg, Jon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Ella + Mila, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29171846)Document filed by Susan Competello..(Norinsberg, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, DR. LETTER - LEGAL BLINDNESS, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, ELLA MILA - WAVE - DETAILS, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, ELLA MILA - WAVE - REFERENCES, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, ELLA MILA - WAVE - ERRORS, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, ACCESSIBILITY - SORT SITE, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, ALT. TEXT LACKS DESCRIPTION - SORT SITE, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, BROKEN LINKS - SORT SITE, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY GENERAL |