Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:24-cv-01403
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332pip
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:23-cv-02305
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
BENJAMIN W. HULSE
Blackwell Burke P.A.
contact info
Elisha C. Biel
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
John W. Ursu
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
RENEE M. DUDEK
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Christine R M Kain
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
CHRISTINE R.M. KAIN
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrew Gay Jackson
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
ODERAH C NWAEZE
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By
BENJAMIN W. HULSE
Blackwell Burke P.A.
contact info
COREY L. GORDON
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
EUGENE HUMMEL
Norton Rose Fullbright Us LLP
contact info
Elisha C. Biel
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
John W. Ursu
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
RENEE M. DUDEK
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Christine R M Kain
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
CHRISTINE R.M. KAIN
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrew Gay Jackson
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
ODERAH C NWAEZE
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joyce Boncher
Represented By
KYLE W. FARRAR
Farrar & Ball, LLP
contact info
DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck P.C.
contact info
Michael Vincent Ciresi
Ciresi Conlin LLP
contact info
GABRIEL A. ASSAAD
Mcdonald Worley, PC
contact info
BIBEANE METSCH-GARCIA
Ciresi Conlin LLP
contact info
MICHAEL A. SACCHET
Ciresi Conlin LLP
contact info
GENEVIEVE M. ZIMMERMAN
Meshbesher & Spence, Ltd
contact info
JAN M. CONLIN
Ciresi Conlin LLP
contact info
Gabriel Assaad
Mcdonald Worley
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 2/14/25. 2/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
GPO Feb 14 2025
ORDER THAT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF'S GENERAL AND SPECIFIC CAUSATION EXPERTS (ECF NO. 70), DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 71), DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM ON GENERAL CAUSATION (ECF NO. 74), PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM ON GENERAL CAUSATION (ECF NO. 76), PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE (ECF NO. 84), AND PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 85), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS (ECF NO. 70, 71) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 2/14/25. 2/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)

Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
238 238 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Wed 05/07 11:11 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re224 Transcript - PDF,,237 Transcript - PDF,,229 Transcript - PDF,,235 Transcript - PDF,,231 Transcript - PDF,,228 Transcript - PDF,,233 Transcript - PDF,,236 Transcript - PDF,,230 Transcript - PDF,,232 Transcript - PDF,,234 Transcript - PDF,,225 Transcript - PDF,,226 Transcript - PDF,,227 Transcript - PDF,, 5/07/2025 Entered and Copies Emailed.(ahf)
Related: [-]
237 237 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:08 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 14) held on 5/2/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
236 236 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:07 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 13) held on 5/1/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
235 235 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:06 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 12) held on 4/30/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
234 234 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:05 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 11) held on 4/29/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
233 233 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:04 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 10) held on 4/28/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
232 232 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:03 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 9) held on 4/25/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
231 231 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:02 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 8) held on 4/24/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
230 230 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:01 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 7) held on 4/23/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
229 229 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 11:00 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 6) held on 4/22/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
228 228 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 10:59 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 5) held on 4/21/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
227 227 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 10:58 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 4) held on 4/17/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
226 226 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 10:57 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 3) held on 4/16/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
225 225 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 10:55 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVIL JURY TRIAL (DAY 2) held on 4/15/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
224 224 misc Transcript - PDF Wed 05/07 10:53 AM
TRANSCRIPT of CIVI JURY TRIAL (DAY 1) held on 4/14/2025, before Judge JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Court Reporter/Transcriber BOBBIE J. SHANFELDER, RDR, CRR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
223 223 minutes Jury Trial - Held Mon 05/05 9:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER in Courtroom 4B-ALLENTOWN. Jury Trial (Day-14) held on May 2, 2025. Court Reporter: ESR. (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
222 222 minutes Jury Trial - Held Fri 05/02 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER: Jury Trial (DAY 13) held on 5/1/25. Court Reporter: ESR. (er)
Related: [-]
221 221 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Fri 05/02 9:55 AM
Proposed Jury Instructions by 3M Company.(MANDLER, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Communication re Request for Deadlocked Jury Instruction
Thursday, May 01, 2025
220 220 minutes Jury Trial - Held Thu 05/01 10:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER Jury Trial (DAY 12) held on 5/1/25. Court Reporter: ESR. (er)
Related: [-]