California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 3:24-cv-02036
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Fisher Asset Management, LLC
Represented By
Samuel M Schwartz-Fenwick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Ryan R Tikker
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Fisher Investments 401(k) Plan
Represented By
Samuel M Schwartz-Fenwick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Ryan R Tikker
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Liao
Represented By
Joseph Andrew Creitz
Creitz & Serebin LLP
contact info
Lisa Sharon Serebin
Creitz & Serebin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 04/04 11:13 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Frank Liao LR Civ 3-15 Certification (Creitz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/03 3:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Liao.. (Creitz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/03 3:23 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/03 2:46 PM
Proposed Summons.(Creitz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons [proposed] Summons to the FISHER INVESTMENTS 401(k) PLAN
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/03 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT for Benefits, Breaches of Fiduciary Duties, and Prohibited Transactions under ERISA against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19287444.). Filed by Frank Liao.(Creitz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet