Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Leonard T Strand
Referred: Kelly KE Mahoney
Case #: 3:24-cv-03019
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 3:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael Deines
810 South Washington
Scott City, KS 67871
Represented By
Kent Alan Gummert
Lederer, Weston & Craig, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Deines-Pollan Services, LLC
Represented By
Kent Alan Gummert
Lederer, Weston & Craig, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wells Ag Supply, LLC
55560 150th Avenue
Fonda, IA 50540
Represented By
Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Brownwinick Law Firm
contact info
Brian S McCormac
Brown Winick
contact info
Caitlin Louise Stachon
Brownwinick Law Firm
contact info
Stephanie A. Koltookian
Brownwinick Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, September 23, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Judgment Mon 09/23 8:17 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Deines-Pollan Services, LLC, Michael Deines against Wells Ag Supply, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/23/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
20 20 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/23 8:16 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part14 Motion to Change venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss. It is denied as to the motion to change venue and is granted as to the motion to dismiss based on the doctrine of forum non conveniens. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/23/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
19 19 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Thu 09/12 9:31 AM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 09/09 2:09 PM
Order: The parties' deadline to file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan has passed. The parties must file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by 9/16/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/9/2024. (klh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
17 17 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Thu 09/05 5:18 PM
RESISTANCE to Motion re14 Motion to Change Venue filed by Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
16 16 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/28 11:27 AM
TEXT ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to14 Motion to Change Venue or Alternately Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response due by 9/5/2024. Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/28/24. (djs)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/28 11:16 AM
UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Respond to re14 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiff Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
utility Set/Reset Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Deadlines Fri 08/16 8:28 AM
Set Deadlines: Defendant Deines-Pollan Services, LLC's LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/16/2024. Defendants Michael Deines and Deines-Pollan Services, LLC FRCP 7.1(a)(2) Citizenship Disclosure Statement due by 9/16/2024. (pac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
14 14 motion Change Venue Thu 08/15 3:23 PM
MOTION to Change Venue or Alternatively Dismiss by Defendants Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC. (Gummert, Kent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Pre-Answer Motion to Change Venue or Alternatively Dismiss
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/01 3:42 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint: Defendants answer/response deadline is extended to 8/15/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/1/2024. (Copy to Defendant Deines) (kms)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/01 1:37 PM
UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/02 5:17 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time-Deadline to File Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Wells Ag Supply, LLC. Scheduling Report deadline extended and now due by 08/14/2024. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/02/2024. (jlg)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/02 5:06 PM
UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/02 4:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Ag Supply, LLC. Michael Deines waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 8/1/2024; Deines-Pollan Services, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 8/1/2024.. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/02 4:04 PM
ORDER granting6 Pro se Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Answer deadline extended for Michael Deines and Deines-Pollan Services, LLC to 8/1/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/2/2024. (Copy to Defendant) (rjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
7 7 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Fri 06/28 5:49 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/20 3:15 PM
PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendants Michael Deines and Deines-Pollan Services, LLC. (PSLC) (NEF to Defendant) (rjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 05/23 10:12 AM
***Attorney Caitlin Louise Stachon terminated pursuant to the filing of5 Notice of Withdrawal. (pac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/22 5:57 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney -Caitlin L. Stachon by Plaintiff Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Stachon, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Statement Thu 04/25 1:17 PM
CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement by Wells Ag Supply, LLC pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a)(2). (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 04/24 4:51 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wells Ag Supply, LLC identifying Other Affiliate GW Supply, Inc., Other Affiliate BW Fusion LLC, Other Affiliate Iowa on the Fly, Inc., Other Affiliate TG Custom, LLC for Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/04 8:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Michael Deines and Deines-Pollan Services, LLC ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (pac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Packet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/04 8:23 AM
Chief Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/04 8:25 AM
Set Deadline: Scheduling Report due by 7/2/2024. (pac)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Deadlines Thu 04/04 8:28 AM
Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and FRCP 7.1(a)(2) Citizenship Disclosure Statement due by 4/24/2024. (pac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reassigned Thu 04/04 3:17 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard T Strand (no conflicts identified). Chief Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case. (Action taken pursuant to CJW/LTS chambers) (pac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Dismissal Ddl) Wed 04/03 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4136215.), filed by Wells Ag Supply, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Sale of Goods Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Order,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet