Johnson v. Commissioner, Social Security
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Charles D Austin |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00967 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 2:42 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 4/9/2024. (c/m 4/9/2024) (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
New Case Notification Letter
Thu 04/04 9:31 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Shackema Johnson. (c/m 4/4/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/03 5:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shackema Johnson(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent/decline
Wed 04/03 5:30 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 5:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security, filed by Shackema Johnson.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 BK#, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment | ||
notice
Notice of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/03 5:32 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due on 6/3/2024 unless otherwise ordered.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
order
25 Pct Mag - ORDER: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Wed 04/03 5:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 4/3/2024. (c/m to P docket sheet 4/3/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |