In Re: Christopher Mongiello
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02548 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USBC-SDNY, 23-B-22732 (CGM) |
Debtor
Christopher Mongiello
, |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 03, 2024 6:09 PM EDT |
Appellant
Christopher Mongiello
25 Leroy Place, Penthouse #7
New Rochelle, NY 10805 |
|
Appellee
Indymac Bank, F.S.B.
|
|
Appellee
Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC
|
|
In Re
Christopher Mongiello
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 04/23 11:49 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Christopher Mongiello dated 4/22/2024 re: please remove the motion to strike from this docket, ECF 6.. Document filed by Christopher Mongiello.(rro) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Strike
Thu 04/18 12:52 PM
MOTION TO STRIKE. Document filed by Christopher Mongiello. (rro) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Thu 04/18 10:47 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Christopher Mongiello dated 4/12/2024 re: This is simply to request that you expedite your ruling on my unopposed appeal.. Document filed by Christopher Mongiello.(rro) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
appeal
Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal
Fri 04/12 3:47 PM
DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re:1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Christopher Mongiello..(bkar) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Thu 04/11 4:21 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:24-cv-02468-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Thu 04/11 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 4:24 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Thu 04/04 11:46 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:24-cv-2468. (gp) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Wed 04/03 7:20 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 24-cv-2468..(bkar) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/03 5:48 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Christopher Mongiello..(bkar) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 04/03 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated March 18, 2024. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 23-7033A, 23-B-22732. Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Christopher Mongiello..(bkar) |
|
utility
Bankruptcy Appeal Referred as Possibly Related/Similar - Crt
Wed 04/03 5:47 PM
BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 24-cv-2468. (bkar) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/03 5:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar) |