West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:Robert C Chambers
Case #: 3:24-cv-00167
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc.
and 3301 ALT 19 Lot #470
Dunedin, FL 34698
Defendant
Jeffrey W. Brown
3301 ALT 19 Lot#470
Dunedin, FL 34698
Plaintiff
Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc.
Represented By
Steven P. Turner
Jenkins Fenstermaker
contact info
Megan L. Southern
Jenkins Fenstermaker
contact info
Plaintiff
Nika Hettlinger
Represented By
Steven P. Turner
Jenkins Fenstermaker
contact info
Megan L. Southern
Jenkins Fenstermaker
contact info
Plaintiff
Dallas Nibert
Represented By
Steven P. Turner
Jenkins Fenstermaker
contact info
Megan L. Southern
Jenkins Fenstermaker
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, June 21, 2024
22 22 misc Return Receipt Card (Generic) Fri 06/21 3:38 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT CARD received, re:18 Clerk's Judgment mailed by certified mail to Jeffrey W. Brown; Returned to Sender. (mkw)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Return Receipt Card (Generic) Fri 06/21 3:36 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT CARD received, re:18 Clerk's Judgment mailed by certified mail to B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations, Inc.; Returned to Sender. (mkw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
18 18 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 06/07 11:30 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR A SUM CERTAIN BY DEFAULT directing that judgment be entered in favor of Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc., Dallas Nibert, Nika Hettlinger against B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc., Jeffrey W. Brown in the amount of $100,000.00, plus litigation costs; further directing that Plaintiffs are awarded post-judgment interest against Defendants on the full amount of this judgment from the date of entry of this order at the current prevailing statutory rate until this judgment is paid in full. (cc: counsel of record; defendants via certified mail) (mkw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt for B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc.,
Att: 2 Certified Mail Receipt for Jeffrey W. Brown
Friday, May 17, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/17 1:54 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Judgment for a Sum Certain by Default by Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc., Nika Hettlinger, Dallas Nibert. (Southern, Megan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Default Judgment By The Clerk Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1), FRCivP Fri 05/17 1:49 PM
MOTION by Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc., Dallas Nibert, Nika Hettlinger for Judgment of Default against B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc., Jeffrey W. Brown.(Southern, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Proofs of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Affidavit Establishing a Sum Certain
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP Fri 05/17 8:59 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc. (Southern, Megan)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP Fri 05/17 8:58 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Dallas Nibert. (Southern, Megan)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP Fri 05/17 8:57 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Nika Hettlinger. (Southern, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Failure to File Disclosure Statement Wed 05/15 8:23 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to Dallas Nibert, Nika Hettlinger, and Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc. (skm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
9 9 order Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/09 2:42 PM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK as to B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc., Jeffrey W. Brown pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (cc: counsel of record; defendants via certified mail) (jsa) (Modified on 5/9/2024 to replace image) (mkw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 certified mail receipt as to Jeffrey W. Brown,
Att: 2 certified mail receipt as to B & D Dental Equipment Liquidations, Inc.
8 8 misc Transmitted Certified Copy Thu 05/09 2:36 PM
TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of7 Order to counsel of record; to defendants via certified mail. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 certified mail receipt as to Jeffrey W. Brown,
Att: 2 certified mail receipt as to B & D Dental Equipment Liquidations, Inc.
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Default by Clerk pursuant to Rule 55(a), FRCivP Thu 05/09 2:27 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's6 MOTION for Entry of Default; directing the Clerk of Court to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against Defendants B&D Equipment Liquidations Inc. and Jeffrey W. Brown; further directing counsel for Plaintiffs to file the appropriate motions and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/9/2024. (cc: counsel of record; defendants) (jsa)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Default (Entry of) By The Clerk Pursuant To Rule 55(a), FRCivP Thu 05/09 11:53 AM
MOTION by Crews & Nibert, D.D.S., Inc., Dallas Nibert, Nika Hettlinger for Entry of Default by Clerk against B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc., Jeffrey W. Brown. (Turner, Steven) (Modified on 5/9/2024 to add the name of the defendants) (mkw)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Of Docket Correction Thu 05/09 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:9 ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK. Error: The image did not contain an "Entered" stamp. Correction: Replaced incorrect image with correct image. (mkw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State Mon 04/15 2:18 PM
SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 4/10/2024 as to B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003933230 . (mkw)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State Mon 04/15 2:16 PM
SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 4/10/2024 as to Jeffrey W. Brown. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003933247 . (mkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 order Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters Wed 04/03 3:15 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (jsa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/03 3:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to B&D Dental Equipment Liquidations Inc., Jeffrey W. Brown, re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 summons as to Jeffrey W. Brown) (jsa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/03 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8625081. (jsa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons as to B & D Dental Equipment Liquidations, Inc.,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons as to Jeffrey W. Brown,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned Thu 04/04 9:19 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
Related: [-]