Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Byron B Conway
Case #: 1:24-cv-00408
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Door County Circuit Court, 24 CV 09
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 4:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Walmart Inc
Represented By
Heather L Nelson
Everson Whitney Everson & Brehm Sc
contact info
Involuntary Plaintiff
Anthem Insurance Companies Inc
Represented By
Dalia Maaitah
Russell Oliver & Stephens PLC
contact info
Involuntary Plaintiff
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Involuntary Plaintiff
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew Robert Falk
Falk Legal Group
contact info
Involuntary Plaintiff
Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Plaintiff
Gail D Austin
Represented By
Zachary J Buchta
Pinkert Law Firm LLP
contact info
Jon R Pinkert
Pinkert Law Firm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
19 19 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 02/12 1:56 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by District Judge Byron B Conway on 2/12/2025: In light of the stipulation of dismissal (ECF No.17 ), this action is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (cc: all counsel) (Conway, Byron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Tue 02/11 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re17 STIPULATION for dismissal filed by Walmart Inc. The incorrect event was chosen. Any request for court action must be filed as a motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b)(1). And when appropriate, adding, A stipulated request for court action may be filed as a stipulated motion. NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re18 Proposed Document filed by Walmart Inc ; Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulated motion or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word format. These documents do not to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 misc Proposed Document Mon 02/10 4:18 PM
PROPOSED Order for Dismissal filed by Walmart Inc. (Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/10 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Walmart Inc. (Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 order Text Only Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 01/27 2:20 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by District Judge Byron B Conway on 1/27/2025: The final pretrial conference and jury trial are cancelled in light of the parties' settlement (ECF No.15 ). (cc: all counsel)(Conway, Byron)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Fri 01/17 4:01 PM
LETTER from Attorney Heather Nelson re case settled . (Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
notice 1 - BBC Reassignment Notice Wed 01/08 2:34 PM
This case has been reassigned to newly appointed District Judge Byron B Conway. Absent further order of the court, all deadlines and hearings currently scheduled remain in effect. (mav)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah Streck on behalf of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeremiah L. Streck (Streck, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 07/23 9:43 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Falk, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 07/23 9:42 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Falk, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/23 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Falk on behalf of UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew R. Falk (Falk, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 respoth Answer to Crossclaim Mon 05/20 9:17 AM
ANSWER to Claim and Crossclaim of the Kroger Co. Welfare Benefit Plan by its Claims Administrator, UnitedHealthCare Services, Inc. filed by Walmart Inc. (Nelson, Heather) Modified answer text on 5/20/2024 (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/02 3:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/2/2024. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/02 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 5/2/2024. Discovery due by 2/3/2025, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 9/3/2024, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 12/2/2024, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 7/1/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach, Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #Zoom 050224) (mac)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/02 3:32 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Walmart Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
6 6 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Fri 04/26 2:58 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Walmart,Inc. (Nelson, Heather) and by Gail D Austin. (Buchta, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 respoth Answer to Counterclaim Thu 04/18 2:12 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim and Cross-Claims filed by Walmart Inc. (Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/18 2:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc.(Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/11 3:02 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED to 5/2/2024 at 09:20 AM (CT) before Judge William C Griesbach. The parties shall call the court Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 , use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308 , press # to bypass Participant ID,and enter Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerks Office at 920-884-3720. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
3 3 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/10 9:45 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gail D Austin. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Buchta, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/05 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2024 09:50 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. The parties shall call the court Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 , use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308 , press # to bypass Participant ID,and enter Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerks Office at 920-884-3720. (cc: all counsel) (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/03 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Door County Circuit Court, Case Number: 24 CV 09 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4647118)(Nelson, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Exhibit A Complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Exhibit B Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 04/03 4:18 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Stephen Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew)
Related: [-]