Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Case #: 1:24-cv-00903
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 2:32 AM MDT
Defendant
Jonathan Cabrera
Represented By
Andrew Edward Swan
Leventhal Lewis Kuhn Taylor Swan PC
contact info
Michael Dickson Kuhn
Leventhal Lewis Kuhn Taylor Swan PC
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Cabrera
Represented By
Andrew Edward Swan
Leventhal Lewis Kuhn Taylor Swan PC
contact info
Michael Dickson Kuhn
Leventhal Lewis Kuhn Taylor Swan PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Sturgeon
Represented By
Joseph Anthony O'Keefe
Baker Law Group, LLC
contact info
Renee Marie Gerni
Baker Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
99 99 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Mon 03/17 11:07 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case. Text Only Entry (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
98 98 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Fri 03/14 12:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Benjamin Sturgeon. (O'Keefe, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
97 97 minutes Status Conference Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/13 10:28 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell: Status Conference held on 3/12/2025. The final version of the settlement agreement shall be executed by 3/13/2025 and the parties shall file stipulated dismissal documents on or before 3/14/2025. Plaintiff's Renewed dismissal motion at ECF No.25 is WITHDRAWN. FTR: Courtroom 101. (evaug)
Related: [-]
96 96 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/12 1:54 PM
NOTICE Regarding Status of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Lisa Cabrera, Jonathan Cabrera (Cooper, Keslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
95 95 order Minute Order Tue 03/11 8:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is set for March 12, 2025, at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Conference will be conducted in person in Courtroom 101 of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado at Colorado Springs located at 212 N. Wahsatch Avenue, Colorado Springs, CO 80903. Counsel are directed to bring hard copies and electronic copies of the latest draft of the settlement agreement. Additionally, all parties are directed to be available by video for the duration of the conference . The Court will provide assistance with the final settlement agreement and hear arguments on Plaintiff's request to file a motion for sanctions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 3/11/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
94 94 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 4:19 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Benjamin Sturgeon.(Lang, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
93 93 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/10 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/10/2025, re:91 Defendants' Second Status Report on the Status of Settlement. ORDERED that, on or before March 12, 2025 , defendants shall either file a motion to withdraw their motion to dismiss or indicate that they do not intend to withdraw the motion. (dgumb, ) Modified on 3/10/2025 to edit text (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
92 92 order Minute Order Mon 03/10 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed91 Defendants' Second Status Report on the Status of Settlement. The deadline to file dismissal papers is extended to March 24, 2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 3/10/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
Related: [-]
91 91 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 2:30 PM
Second STATUS REPORT re Settlement Status by Defendants Lisa Cabrera, Jonathan Cabrera. (Cooper, Keslie)
Related: [-]