Lee v. Nails & Spa Together, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02549 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chyrim Choi
|
|
Defendant
Nails & Spa On Second Avenue, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nails & Spa Together, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Chong Suk Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/22 10:20 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,12 Amended Complaint, against Nails & Spa Together, Inc., Nails & Spa On Second Avenue, Inc., Chyrim Choi with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Chong Suk Lee. Related document:1 Complaint,12 Amended Complaint,..(Kim, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/18 2:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ryan J. Kim to RE-FILE re: Document No. 12 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/17 12:03 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Chyrim Choi, Nails & Spa On Second Avenue, Inc., Nails & Spa Together, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Chong Suk Lee. Related document:1 Complaint..(Kim, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/04 6:47 PM
ORDER To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by June 5, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/4/2024) (jca) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/04 6:40 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by June 5, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/4/2024) (ate) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/04 6:37 PM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b )(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/4/2024) (ate) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 1:28 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chyrim Choi..(pc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 1:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nails & Spa Together, Inc...(pc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 1:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nails & Spa On Second Avenue, Inc...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 9:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 9:56 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 9:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/04 9:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryan J. Kim. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 6:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chyrim Choi, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chong Suk Lee..(Kim, Ryan) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 6:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nails & Spa On Second Avenue, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chong Suk Lee..(Kim, Ryan) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 6:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nails & Spa Together, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chong Suk Lee..(Kim, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 6:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kim, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 6:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Chyrim Choi, Nails & Spa On Second Avenue, Inc., Nails & Spa Together, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29172322)Document filed by Chong Suk Lee..(Kim, Ryan) |