Girotto v. Hastens Beds, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02552 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Grand Loft Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Hastens Beds, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Luigi Girotto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/04 4:30 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint upon each Defendant, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. In their discussions, the parties should consider whether Plaintiff has satisfied the threshold requirement of standing. See e.g., Calcano v. Swarovski N. Am. Ltd., 36 F.4th 68, 7778 (2d Cir. 2022); Harty v. W. Point Realty, Inc., 28 F.4th 435, 44344 (2d Cir. 2022). To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter informing the Court whether the parties have settled. If the parties do not reach a settlement, the parties shall in the joint letter request that the Court (1) refer the case to mediation or a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) proceed with an initial status conference. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this Order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules & Practices (the "Individual Rules"), available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-margaret-m-garnett, forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Individual Rules to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/4/2024) (tg) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 1:17 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hastens Beds, Inc...(pc) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 1:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grand Loft Corp...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/04 10:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/04 10:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/04 10:46 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 8:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GRAND LOFT CORP., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/03 8:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HASTENS BEDS, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/03 8:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 8:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Grand Loft Corp., Hastens Beds, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29172552)Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) |