Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:24-cv-00953
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Carlos Del Toro
Represented By
Charles R Gayle
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn R. Towery
1994 Dresden Cove
Round Rock, TX 78665


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/22 1:26 PM
RETURN DOCUMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/21/2024. (c/m p 10/22/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Thursday, October 10, 2024
18 18 misc Transcript Thu 10/10 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/5/2024, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858; trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 24. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/31/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2025.(pms, Court Reporter)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Fri 09/06 2:42 PM
ORDER granting16 the parties' Consent Motion to Transfer Case; transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/6/2024. (c/m p 9/6/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Transfer Case Fri 09/06 11:35 AM
Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by Carlos Del Toro(Gayle, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Remark Fri 09/06 2:43 PM
Remark: Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 09/06 8:24 AM
ORDER denying13 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; the parties shall file a Consent Motion to Transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia no later than 9/9/2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/5/2024. (c/m p 9/6/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 09/05 11:09 AM
Case Management Conference held on 9/5/2024 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 motion Default - Judgment Thu 08/29 3:43 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Glenn R. Towery (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/29 12:23 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for September 5, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss11 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 09051030 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/29/2024 (c/m p 8/29/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/26 4:59 PM
NOTICE by Carlos Del Toro of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss (Gayle, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 07/02 10:16 AM
(Corrected) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn R. Towery. Carlos Del Toro served on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 06/17 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn R. Towery. Carlos Del Toro served on 5/28/2024, answer due 7/29/2024.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Reissued Thu 05/30 11:48 AM
Summons Reissued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m p 5/30/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/30 11:47 AM
ORDER directing that the Clerk shall reissue summons and return summons to Towery. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/30/2024. (c/m p 5/30/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 05/29 1:30 PM
Correspondence from Glenn R. Towery re: Request for Court to Re-Issue Summons (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed New Summons,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 04/24 10:16 AM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Carlos Del Toro, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m p 4/24/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/24 10:14 AM
ORDER directing that the Clerk shall issue summons and return summons to Towery; Towery shall serve the Defendant with the appropriate summons and the Complaint by 7/2/2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/24/2024. (c/m p 4/24/2024 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Wed 04/03 10:07 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/3/2024. (c/m p 4/3/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 04/03 8:48 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Glenn R. Towery. (c/m p 4/3/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/03 8:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Carlos Del Toro ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 1873.), filed by Glenn R. Towery. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Memorandum for Record,
Att: 5 Reference Enclosures,
Att: 6 Memorandum of Federal Statutes,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4,
Att: 11 Exhibit 5,
Att: 12 Exhibit 6,
Att: 13 Exhibit 7,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8,
Att: 15 Exhibit 9,
Att: 16 Exhibit 10,
Att: 17 Exhibit 11,
Att: 18 Exhibit 12