Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00099
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Lexus Nicole Fenix (2)
Represented By
Whitney Mauldin
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Lindsey Hanna Holguin
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kory Bryan Tuell (1)
Represented By
Benjamin Nemec
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Christopher P Frey
Federal Public Defender - District Of Nevada
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John E Brasher
Doj-Usao
contact info
Reagan Vincent Reininger
United States Attorney'S Office (tulsa)
contact info
Stephen Flynn
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 4:27 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne by USA as to Kory Tuell (1), Lexus Nicole Fenix (2) (dla, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/22/2024 Defendant's name corrected by interlineation per14 to reflect the name of Kory Bryan Tuell (ll, Dpty Clk). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/25/2024) (tjc, Dpty Clk). Modified on 3/25/2024 to replace pdf with corrected filed date (tjc, Dpty Clk). [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne as to Kory Tuell (dla, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (dla, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
***Case Unsealed as to Kory Tuell, Lexus Nicole Fenix (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Kory Tuell [Note: Attorney Stephen Flynn added to party USA(pty:pla).] (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Kory Tuell (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 4 MOTION for Detention
6 6 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ] Modified on 4/2/2024 - WITHDRAWN per 38 (lmt, Dpty Clk).
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 6 MOTION for Detention
8 8 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Initial Appearance held on 3/21/2024 , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Initial Appearance set for 3/22/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman), ordering defendant be detained as to Kory Tuell (Court Reporter: C1) (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Initial Appearance held on 3/21/2024 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #7 granted, appointing FPD attorney Whitney Mauldin,Lindsey Hanna Holguin for Lexus Nicole Fenix, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 3/26/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Preliminary Hearing set for 3/26/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman), ordering defendant be detained as to Lexus Nicole Fenix Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 7 MOTION for Hearing
10 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , appointing FPD attorney as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman Ordering defendant be detained pending detention and preliminary hearings , ordering defendant be detained as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman re: Brady as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen Flynn on behalf of USA (Flynn, Stephen) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Initial Appearance held on 3/22/2024 , appointing FPD attorney, correcting defendant's name by interlineation to Kory Bryan Tuell and amending all previous filings by interlineation to reflect same, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 3/28/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Preliminary Hearing set for 3/28/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman), ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #5 granted, ordering defendant be detained as to Kory Tuell Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 5 MOTION for Hearing
15 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , appointing FPD attorney as to Kory Bryan Tuell (ll, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 15 replaced on 3/25/2024 attached corrected PDF to show correct date) (ll, Dpty Clk). [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , ordering defendant be detained as to Kory Bryan Tuell (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman re: Brady as to Kory Bryan Tuell (ll, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 17 replaced on 3/25/2024 attached corrected PDF to show correct date) (ll, Dpty Clk). [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 WARRANT Returned Executed by USA as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 WARRANT Returned Executed by USA as to Kory Bryan Tuell (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
18 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (FPD) by Christopher P Frey on behalf of Kory Bryan Tuell [Note: Attorney Christopher P Frey added to party Kory Bryan Tuell(pty:dft).] (Frey, Christopher) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
19 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (FPD) by Benjamin Nemec, I on behalf of Kory Bryan Tuell [Note: Attorney Benjamin Nemec, I added to party Kory Bryan Tuell(pty:dft).] (Nemec, Benjamin) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong date on order; Correction: replaced PDF to show the correct date Related [+] as to Kory Bryan Tuell (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 15 Order, Appointing FPD Attorney
23 23 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong date on order; Correction: replaced PDF to show the correct date Related [+] as to Kory Bryan Tuell (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 17 Order
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
24 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John E Brasher on behalf of USA [Note: Attorney John E Brasher added to party USA(pty:pla).] (Brasher, John) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
25 25 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Detention Hearing held on 3/26/2024 , Preliminary Examination held on 3/26/2024 , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 3/29/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Preliminary Hearing set for 3/29/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman), ordering defendant be detained as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (Court Reporter: C1) (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
26 26 MOTION to Compel Adverse Witnesses at Preliminary Hearing by Kory Bryan Tuell (Nemec, Benjamin) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
27 27 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Huntsman Related [+] as to Kory Bryan Tuell (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 26 MOTION to Compel Adverse Witnesses at Preliminary Hearing
28 28 6 pgs OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #26 denied Related [+] as to Kory Bryan Tuell (SHJ, Judge) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 26 MOTION to Compel Adverse Witnesses at Preliminary Hearing
Thursday, March 28, 2024
29 29 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Detention Hearing held on 3/28/2024 , Preliminary Examination held on 3/28/2024 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #4 granted, ordering defendant be detained, striking/terminating deadline(s)/hearing(s) as to Kory Bryan Tuell Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-] 4 MOTION for Detention
30 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , ordering defendant be detained as to Kory Bryan Tuell (dlg, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
31 31 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Detention Hearing held on 3/29/2024 , Preliminary Examination held on 3/29/2024 , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Preliminary Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne), ordering defendant be detained as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (Court Reporter: c1) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00174-JFJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
32 32 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Kory Bryan Tuell, Lexus Nicole Fenix (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
33 33 INDICTMENT by USA as to Kory Bryan Tuell (1) count(s) 1, Lexus Nicole Fenix (2) count(s) 2 (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
34 34 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #33 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
35 35 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kory Bryan Tuell (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
36 36 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Lexus Nicole Fenix (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]