Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00118
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 12:21 AM PDT
Defendant
James Paul Ullman (1)
Represented By
Conor Huseby
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kate Anne Rochat
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2024 12:53 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Sealed Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You as to James Paul Ullman (1). (gd) [3:24-mj-00040]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
4 4 1 pgs ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Seal Case as to James Paul Ullman (1) Signed on 3/5/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (gd) [3:24-mj-00040]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
5 5 Minutes of Proceedings: First Appearance before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo as to Defendant James Paul Ullman held 3/14/2024. Order unsealing case. Order appointing counsel: Conor Huseby. Defendant advised of rights. Defendant waived reading of the Complaint. Defendant proceeds as named in the Complaint. Defendant waived preliminary hearing. Defendants Location-Custody status is: Detained as Flight Risk/Danger. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached Order. Arraignment set for 4/11/2024 at 1:30PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel for the defendant is encouraged to discuss with the defendant the option to waive arraignment in accordance with Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 10(b). Any waiver of arraignment should be filed with the Court once the defendant has been charged by Indictment or Information and ahead of the scheduled arraignment date. Counsel Present for Government: Mira Chernick (for Kate Rochat). Counsel Present for Defendant: Conor Huseby. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca) (gm) [3:24-mj-00040]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant James Paul Ullman. Signed on 3/14/24 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm) [3:24-mj-00040]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/13/2024 as to James Paul Ullman. (gd) [3:24-mj-00040]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
8 8 Indictment Related [+] as to James Paul Ullman (1). Count 1: Felon in Possession of a Firearm (Forfeiture Allegation.) (dino)
Related: [-] dacted
9 9 Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant James Paul Ullman. (dino)
Related: [-]
10 10 Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant James Paul Ullman. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal) . (dino)
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dino)
Related: [-]