Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00073
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Walter Samayoa-Revolorio (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Arnold B. Corsmeier
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2024 3:48 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Walter Samayoa-Revolorio (1) count(s) 1. (ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
2 2 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to Walter Samayoa-Revolorio. (ELM)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Arrest Warrant as to Walter Samayoa-Revolorio (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/3/2024. (ELM)
Related: [-]