California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:24-cv-02009
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2024
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2024 2:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Kulwant Kaur
2864 Hilltop Mall Road
Richmond, CA 94806
Defendant
Gurkirpal Singh
2864 Hilltop Mall Road
Richmond, CA 94806
Plaintiff
Gurpreet Singh
2864 Hilltop Mall Road
Richmond, CA 94806

GPO Oct 29 2024
ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT: The court dismisses Plaintiff's amended complaint without prejudice and orders that the case be closed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/29/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/29 10:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT: The court dismisses Plaintiff's amended complaint without prejudice and orders that the case be closed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/29/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 07, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 09/07 10:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Gurpreet Singh. (Singh, Gurpreet)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
17 17 5 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 08/16 2:31 PM
ORDER granting 16 Administrative Motion for Reconsideration ; Granting IFP Application; Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. subsection 1915(E).Signed by by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/16/2024. Amended Complaint due by 9/6/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 08/14 1:03 AM
First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Reconsideration filed by Gurpreet Singh. Responses due by 8/19/2024.(Singh, Gurpreet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 07/23 10:23 AM
ORDER DENYING 3 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Plaintiff must pay the filing fee of $405.00 in full by no later than 8/13/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/23/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 06/26 11:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kulwant Kaur. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 06/26 11:31 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gurkirpal Singh. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
12 12 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 06/25 12:21 PM
ORDER VACATING 7/3/2024 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 4 and 10 : Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2024 01:30 PM has been VACATED.The court will reschedule the Initial Case Management Conference if and when appropriate. Plaintiff's motion to appear at the Case Management Conference by telephone 10 is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/25/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 06/20 9:56 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear by Telephone Thu 06/20 12:50 AM
First MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Gurpreet Singh. (Singh, Gurpreet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
9 9 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Thu 05/16 11:35 AM
RESPONSE by Kulwant Kaur, Gurkirpal Singh. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/14 12:59 PM
NOTICE by Gurpreet Singh (Singh, Gurpreet)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/06 2:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gurpreet Singh.. (Singh, Gurpreet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 05/02 6:44 PM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 04/17 7:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 04/03 10:22 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/03 10:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gurpreet Singh. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/03 10:18 AM
Proposed Summons filed by Gurpreet Singh. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/03 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Kulwant Kaur, Gurkirpal Singh. Filed by Gurpreet Singh. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2024.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet