New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-09020
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Jan 05, 2024
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
JASON SEIB (1)
Terminated: 01/05/2024
Represented By
ANDREW C. OLESNYCKY
Stahl/gasiorowski, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Terminated: 01/05/2024
Represented By
INGRID EICHER
Doj-Usao
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/04/2024 4:27 AM EDT
Friday, January 05, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of JASON SEIB (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Notice to Norther Alabama of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to JASON SEIB. Your case number is: 23-419. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to InterdistrictTransfer_NJD@njd.uscourts.gov.) (tjg, )
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to JASON SEIB held on 1/5/2024 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 20 as to JASON SEIB: Appointment of Attorney ANDREW C. OLESNYCKY for JASON SEIB.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
5 5 Brady ORDER as to JASON SEIB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by JASON SEIB (tjg, )
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to JASON SEIB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to JASON SEIB. Defendant committed to District of Northern Alabama.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]