LENY Berry Mezz LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth S Stong |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-41452 |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
LENY Berry Mezz LLC
188 Berry St Apt 190
Brooklyn, NY 11249-3112 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Tue 04/30 2:11 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of LENY Berry Mezz LLC. (Donovan, J) |
|
Att: 1 proposed order | ||
Att: 2 proposed notice | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Mon 04/22 9:29 AM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of LENY Berry Mezz LLC (Donovan, J) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
17
pgs
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Fri 04/19 4:10 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of LENY Berry Mezz LLC (Donovan, J) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Thu 04/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 8:38 AM
Order Granting Admission to Joshua R. Gross to Practice Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Creditor, WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust . Signed on 4/12/2024. (jag) |
|
12 | 12
order
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 8:35 AM
Order Granting Admission to Thomas S. Kiriakos to Practice Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Creditor, WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust . Signed on 4/12/2024. (jag) |
|
11 | 11
order
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 8:31 AM
Order Granting Admission to Craig E. Reimer to Practice Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Creditor, WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust . Signed on 4/12/2024. (jag) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Mon 04/15 8:24 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference . Signed on 4/12/2024. Case Management Conference to be held via video on 5/31/2024 at 10:30 AM before the Honorable Judge Stong (jag) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 5:43 PM
Motion for Joshua R. Gross to Appear Pro Hac Vice for WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust. Fee Amount $200. Filed by Jim Hennessey on behalf of WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust. (Hennessey, Jim) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support Of Motion | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 5:33 PM
Motion for Thomas S. Kiriakos to Appear Pro Hac Vice for WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust. Fee Amount $200. Filed by Jim Hennessey on behalf of WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust. (Hennessey, Jim) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support Of Motion | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 5:24 PM
Motion for Craig E. Reimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust. Fee Amount $200. Filed by Jim Hennessey on behalf of WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust. (Hennessey, Jim) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support Of Motion | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 04/10 5:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jim Hennessey on behalf of WF CREL 2020 Grantor Trust (Hennessey, Jim) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Wed 04/10 5:26 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK:1 24-41452 ess] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22535656. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Wed 04/10 5:34 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK:1 24-41452 ess] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22535667. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Wed 04/10 5:45 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK:1 24-41452 ess] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22535686. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/08 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sun 04/07 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee
Thu 04/04 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Sussman, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thu 04/04 8:34 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors (PDF Version only) Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 4/4/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/4/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/4/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/4/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/4/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 4/18/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/18/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/18/2024. Schedule D due 4/18/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/18/2024. Schedule G due 4/18/2024. Schedule H due 4/18/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/18/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/18/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/18/2024. (nwh) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 04/04 7:59 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of LENY Berry Mezz LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/2/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 08/2/2024. (Nash, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Local Rule 1007-4 Declaration | ||
Att: 2 Consent of Independent Managers and Resolutions | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 04/04 8:00 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-41452 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22515964. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |